EP1832005 - METHOD FOR MULTI-PATH DETECTION IN SPREAD SPECTRUM RECEIVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states France Brevets 47, rue de la Victoire 75009 Paris / FR | [2013/16] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIETILA, Samuli Eetunkatu 2 B 7 FIN-33560 Tampere / FI | 02 /
VALIO, Harri Vattulantie 17 FIN-34240 Kammenniemi / FI | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Hammes, Pierre Marks & Clerk France Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Hammes, Pierre Marks & Clerk France Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2012/51] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | ||
Former [2007/37] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05810454.8 | 27.10.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005IB03203 | Priority number, date | US20040026503 | 29.12.2004 Original published format: US 26503 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006070223 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1832005 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1832005 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/22, H04B1/7075 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
H04B1/7075 (EP,US);
G01S19/22 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70715 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/37] | H04B1/707, G01S1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MEHRWEGEDETEKTION IN SPREIZSPEKTRUM-EMPFÄNGERN | [2007/37] | English: | METHOD FOR MULTI-PATH DETECTION IN SPREAD SPECTRUM RECEIVERS | [2007/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETECTION MULTIVOIE DANS DES RECEPTEURS A SPECTRE ETALE | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 21.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.12.2012 | BE | 19.12.2012 | CY | 19.12.2012 | CZ | 19.12.2012 | DK | 19.12.2012 | EE | 19.12.2012 | FI | 19.12.2012 | IT | 19.12.2012 | LT | 19.12.2012 | LV | 19.12.2012 | MC | 19.12.2012 | RO | 19.12.2012 | SE | 19.12.2012 | SI | 19.12.2012 | SK | 19.12.2012 | BG | 19.03.2013 | GR | 20.03.2013 | IS | 19.04.2013 | PT | 19.04.2013 | [2014/25] |
Former [2014/03] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 19.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1117187 (HITACHI INT ELECTRIC INC [JP]) [X] 1-5,14-18,27,28,31,32 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0049] * * figures 7,10,11; claim 1 * [Y] 6-13,19-26,29,30; | [XA]US6532255 (GUNZELMANN BERTRAM [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,14-18,28-32 * column 2, line 40 - line 67 * * column 4, line 54 - column 6, line 65 * * figures 4-7 * [A] 6-13,19-26; | [XA]WO2004036238 (NORDNAV TECHNOLOGIES AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,14-16,18,27-32 * page 28, line 10 - line 34 * * abstract * * page 24, line 8 - line 27 * * page 30, line 23 - line 35 * * figures 10,11,14,16 * [A] 6-13,19-26; | [Y]EP1143652 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [Y] 6-13,19-26,29,30 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1,3 * | International search | [X]US2001002203 (CAHN CHARLES R [US], et al); | [X]US5347536 (MEEHAN THOMAS K [US]); | [A]EP1143652 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) | by applicant | EP1117187 | US6532255 | WO2004036238 | EP1143652 |