10.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] |
03.09.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
27.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
24.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
28.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] |
14.11.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
13.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
10.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
26.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
19.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
29.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
22.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
01.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
01.08.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
25.07.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
30.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
23.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
07.12.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
07.12.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
27.11.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.11.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.07.2007 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.06.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
15.06.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
07.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|