EP1807322 - AUTOMATIC SPRAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.C. Johnson & Son, Inc. 1525 Howe Street Racine, WI 53403 / US | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURNER, Paul, E. 3400 Orion Court Racine, WI 53406 / US | 02 /
GASPER, Thomas, P. N101 W14353 Huckleberry Court Germantown, WI 53022 / US | 03 /
KUBICEK, Chris, A. W2044 Kings Parkway East Troy, WI 53120 / US | 04 /
LEMON, Leon, M. 420 North Main Street Mendon, UT 84325 / US | 05 /
MADSEN, Brent, D. 25 Sarah Street Providence, UT 84332 / US | 06 /
WESTPHAL, Nathan, R. 145 Wellington Drive Union Grove, WI 53182 / US | 07 /
MICHAELS, Kenneth, W. 208 Baron Drive Spring Grove, IL 60081 / US | 08 /
NELSON, Cory, J. 416 Shelley Drive Racine, WI 53405 / US | 09 /
CARPENTER, M., Scott 5914 Finch Lane Racine, WI 53402 / US | 10 /
SHORT, Michael, E. 226 Wolff Street Racine, WI 53402 / US | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/29] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05810570.1 | 11.10.2005 | [2007/29] | WO2005US36576 | Priority number, date | US20040617950P | 12.10.2004 Original published format: US 617950 P | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006044416 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1807322 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1807322 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/16 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
B65D83/262 (EP,US);
B65D83/16 (KR);
A01M1/2038 (EP,US);
B05B12/02 (EP,US);
B05B12/12 (EP,US);
B05B12/122 (EP,US);
B65D83/14 (KR);
A61L2209/11 (EP,US);
A61L2209/111 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE SPRÜHVORRICHTUNG | [2007/29] | English: | AUTOMATIC SPRAY DEVICE | [2007/29] | French: | PULVERISATEUR COMPACT | [2007/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 02.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07011131.5 / EP1832526 | EP07011132.3 / EP1832527 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.01.2008 | BE | 09.01.2008 | CH | 09.01.2008 | CY | 09.01.2008 | CZ | 09.01.2008 | DK | 09.01.2008 | EE | 09.01.2008 | FI | 09.01.2008 | LI | 09.01.2008 | LT | 09.01.2008 | LV | 09.01.2008 | NL | 09.01.2008 | PL | 09.01.2008 | RO | 09.01.2008 | SI | 09.01.2008 | SK | 09.01.2008 | TR | 09.01.2008 | BG | 09.04.2008 | SE | 09.04.2008 | GR | 10.04.2008 | IS | 09.05.2008 | HU | 10.07.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LV | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
TR | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
HU | 10.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LV | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LV | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LV | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LV | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LV | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CH | 09.01.2008 | |
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 09.01.2008 | |
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 09.01.2008 | |
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SI | 09.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH09183469 ; | [X]US4415797 (CHOUSTOULAKIS NIKITAS [GR]) [X] 1-4,10-14,16,17 * abstract *; | [X]US5673825 (CHEN CHENG-FENG [TW]) [X] 1-4,10-14,16,17 * abstract *; | [XD]US2002130146 (BORUT SEVERINE N [US], et al) [XD] 1-4,10-14,16-18,25 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09183469 A 19970715 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) [X] 1-4,10-14,16,17 * abstract * |