EP1817679 - ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYSTEM FOR USE IN AUTOMATION TECHNOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hasberg, Günter Brunebecker Strasse 56 58454 Witten / DE | [2007/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Isfort, Olaf Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestraße 23 (Kortumkarree) 44787 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | Isfort, Olaf Schneiders & Behrendt, Huestrasse 23 44787 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 05810768.1 | 25.11.2005 | [2007/33] | WO2005EP12627 | Priority number, date | DE20041057286 | 26.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004057286 | [2007/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006056457 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1817679 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1817679 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42, G05B19/042, G09G3/32 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
G06F13/4256 (EP);
G06F13/4291 (EP);
G06F3/1446 (EP);
G09G2300/026 (EP);
G09G3/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES STEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR DIE AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK | [2007/33] | English: | ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYSTEM FOR USE IN AUTOMATION TECHNOLOGY | [2007/33] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE ELECTRONIQUE UTILISE EN TECHNIQUE D'AUTOMATISATION | [2007/33] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.11.2009 | CZ | 04.11.2009 | DK | 04.11.2009 | EE | 04.11.2009 | FI | 04.11.2009 | IE | 04.11.2009 | IT | 04.11.2009 | LT | 04.11.2009 | LV | 04.11.2009 | NL | 04.11.2009 | PL | 04.11.2009 | RO | 04.11.2009 | SE | 04.11.2009 | SI | 04.11.2009 | SK | 04.11.2009 | TR | 04.11.2009 | AT | 25.11.2009 | LU | 25.11.2009 | BE | 30.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | FR | 04.01.2010 | BG | 04.02.2010 | GB | 04.02.2010 | GR | 05.02.2010 | ES | 15.02.2010 | IS | 04.03.2010 | PT | 04.03.2010 | HU | 05.05.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/44] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
TR | 04.11.2009 | ||
AT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LU | 25.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 04.01.2010 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GB | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
AT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LU | 25.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 04.01.2010 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GB | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
AT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LU | 25.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GB | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
AT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LU | 25.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GB | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
AT | 25.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GB | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
AT | 25.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/24] | FI | 04.11.2009 | |
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | LT | 04.11.2009 | |
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 15.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1273667 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD [GB]) [X] 16-21 * the whole document *; | [X]US4139149 (CREPEAU PHILIP C, et al) [X] 16-21* the whole document *; | [X]GB2080000 (SHORROCK DEV) [X] 1,4-8,14,15 * abstract *; | [X]EP0586715 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-8,14,15 * the whole document *; | [XA]CH683806 (ERNST FELLER JUN) [X] 1,4-8,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 2,3; | [XA]DE19748293 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-8,14,15 * column 7, line 35 - column 8, line 53; figure 4 * * column 11, line 54 - column 12, line 31 * [A] 2,3 |