EP1825717 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING COLOUR AND COLOUR TEMPERATURE OF LIGHT GENERATED BY A DIGITALLY CONTROLLED LUMINAIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states TIR Technology LP 7700 Riverfront Gate Burnaby, British Columbia V5J 5M4 / CA | ||
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states Tir Systems Ltd. 7700 Riverfront Gate Burnaby, British Columbia V5J 5M4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBINSON, Shane P. RR no.1 283 Owen Road Gibsons, British Columbia V0N 1V1 / CA | 02 /
JUNGWIRTH, Paul 6737 Station Hill Court Apartment 309 Burnaby, British Columbia V3N 4V2 / CA | [2013/32] |
Former [2007/35] | 01 /
ROBINSON, Shane P. RR no.1 283 Owen Road Gibson, British Columbia V0N 1V1 / CA | ||
02 /
JUNGWIRTH, Paul 6737 Station Hill Court Apartment 309 Burnaby, British Columbia V3N 4V2 / CA | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Bekkers, Joost J.J., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/42] | Bekkers, Joost J.J, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/35] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05810845.7 | 23.11.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005CA01773 | Priority number, date | US20040630731P | 23.11.2004 Original published format: US 630731 P | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006056052 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1825717 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1825717 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 01.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/14, G09G3/20, H05B33/08 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
G09G3/14 (EP,US);
G09G3/2011 (EP,US);
H05B45/20 (EP,US);
H05B45/46 (EP,US);
H05B45/48 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0242 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0247 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0666 (EP,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
G09G3/2014 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | H05B33/08 | ||
Former IPC [2007/35] | H05B33/02, H05B37/02, H05B33/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG VON FARBE UND FARBTEMPERATUR VON DURCH EINE DIGITAL GESTEUERTE BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG ERZEUGTEM LICHT | [2007/35] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING COLOUR AND COLOUR TEMPERATURE OF LIGHT GENERATED BY A DIGITALLY CONTROLLED LUMINAIRE | [2007/35] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER LA COULEUR ET LA TEMPERATURE DE COULEUR D'UNE LUMIERE GENEREE PAR UN LUMINAIRE COMMANDE NUMERIQUEMENT | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 09.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2005 | AT | 08.01.2014 | BE | 08.01.2014 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | FI | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | NL | 08.01.2014 | PL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | SE | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
IS | 08.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2004100612 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-5,8,14,15,17-22,26 * page 3, line 33 - page 6, line 11; figures 1-4 * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 14; figure 11 * * page 14, lines 2-26; figures 20,22-25 * [A] 10-13 [I] 6,7,9,24; | [XI]US2004207341 (CALLAHAN JEFFREY SCOTT [US]) [X] 1,4,6,8,17,20,26 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027] - [0029]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0040]; figure 10 * [I] 2,3,5,7,9,14,15,18-22,24; | [X]US6132072 (TURNBULL ROBERT R [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9,15,17-20,23 * column 30, line 26 - column 33, line 19; figure 21 * | International search | [A]JPH0567810 (NEC CORP); | [A]US2002048177 (RAHM PETER R [US], et al); | [A]WO0247438 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [A]US2003107887 (EBERL HEINRICH ALEXANDER [DE]); | [A]JP2003215674 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]US2004036418 (ROOKE ALAN MICHAEL [US], et al); | [X]WO2004093040 (KOMADEN CORP [JP], et al) |