|
23.12.2009 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.05.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.05.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.05.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.05.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
28.09.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.09.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.09.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.09.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
22.03.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
22.03.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
02.12.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.12.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
02.12.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
26.10.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.10.2005 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
26.10.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
26.10.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |