EP1809267 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS BASED ON NK2 ANTAGONISTS FOR PEDIATRIC USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratori Guidotti S.P.A. Loc. La Vettola, Via Livornese 897 56010 S. Piero a Grado PI / IT | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALEOTTI, Alberto c/o LABORATORI GUIDOTTI S.P.A. Via Livornese, 897 Loc. La Vettola I-56010 S. PIERO A GRADO - PISA / IT | 02 /
ALTAMURA, Maria Via S. Gervasio, 32 I-50131 FIRENZE / IT | 03 /
MAGGI, Carlo Alberto Via L. Michelazzi, 43 I-50141 FIRENZE / IT | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2007/30] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A., Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05810894.5 | 26.10.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005EP55575 | Priority number, date | IT2004FI00221 | 27.10.2004 Original published format: IT FI20040221 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006045820 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1809267 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1809267 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K38/12, A61K31/451, A61K31/55, A61P1/06 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
A61K38/12 (EP,NO,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,NO,US);
A61K31/451 (EP,NO,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,NO,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Extension states | AL | 25.05.2007 | BA | 25.05.2007 | HR | 25.05.2007 | MK | 25.05.2007 | YU | 25.05.2007 | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF BASIS VON NK2-ANTAGONISTEN FÜR DEN PÄDIATRISCHEN GEBRAUCH | [2007/30] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS BASED ON NK2 ANTAGONISTS FOR PEDIATRIC USE | [2007/30] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES A BASE D'ANTAGONISTES DE NK2 POUR USAGE PEDIATRIQUE | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 02.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 31.10.2009 | [2019/46] |
Former [2011/32] | MC | 31.10.2009 | |
Former [2011/16] | IT | 26.10.2009 | |
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | MC | 31.10.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9628467 (MENARINI FARMA IND [IT], et al) [X] 13,15-18 * claims 11-14 * * example 4 * [Y] 1-5,7,8,11,12,19,20; | [DA]EP0815126 (MENARINI FARMA IND [IT]); | [XDY]WO0129066 (MENARINI RICERCHE SPA [IT], et al) [XD] 1,2,5,11-13,15,17,18 * claims 11,12 * * page 5, lines 5-29 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 6 * * examples 3,4 * [Y] 1-20; | [DXY]WO03037916 (MENARINI RICERCHE SPA [IT], et al) [DX] 13,15-18 * examples 1,69,72,127,137 * * page 56, line 3; claims 11,12 * [Y] 1-5,11,12,14,19,20; | [XY]WO2004037266 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 13,15-18 * claim 6 * * page 8, columns 14-21 *[Y] 1-5,10-12,14,19,20; | [XY] - GIULIANI S ET AL, "EFFECT OF A TACHYKININ NK2 RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST, NEPADUTANT, ON CARDIOVASCULAR AND GASTROINTESTINAL FUNCTION IN RATS AND DOGS", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (2001), vol. 415, ISSN 0014-2999, pages 61 - 71, XP002945503 [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * [Y] 1-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-2999(01)00794-4 |