EP1817115 - LATERAL GUIDE USED FOR CURTAIN COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REINHARD, Frank Im Lohr 43 68199 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
HORBACH, Harald Goethestr. 109 67435 Neustadt / DE | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/10] |
Former [2008/38] | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2007/33] | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05811277.2 | 21.11.2005 | [2007/33] | WO2005EP12439 | Priority number, date | DE20041056270 | 22.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004056270 | [2007/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006056385 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1817115 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1817115 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B05C5/00, G03C1/74 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
B05C5/005 (EP);
G03C1/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEITENFÜHRUNG FÜR EINE VORHANGBESCHICHTUNG | [2009/51] | English: | LATERAL GUIDE USED FOR CURTAIN COATING | [2007/33] | French: | GUIDAGE LATERAL POUR APPLICATION AU RIDEAU | [2007/33] |
Former [2007/33] | SEITENFÜHRUNG FÜR DIE VORHANGBESCHICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 11.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.06.2010 | CZ | 09.06.2010 | DK | 09.06.2010 | EE | 09.06.2010 | FI | 09.06.2010 | IE | 09.06.2010 | LT | 09.06.2010 | LV | 09.06.2010 | NL | 09.06.2010 | PL | 09.06.2010 | RO | 09.06.2010 | SE | 09.06.2010 | SI | 09.06.2010 | SK | 09.06.2010 | TR | 09.06.2010 | BG | 09.09.2010 | GR | 10.09.2010 | IS | 09.10.2010 | PT | 11.10.2010 | AT | 21.11.2010 | LU | 21.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | HU | 10.12.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
TR | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
AT | 21.11.2010 | ||
LU | 21.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 10.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
AT | 21.11.2010 | ||
LU | 21.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 10.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
AT | 21.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 10.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
AT | 21.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
AT | 21.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | FI | 09.06.2010 | |
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | FI | 09.06.2010 | |
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02081103 (BACHOFEN & MEIER AG MASCHF [CH], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8-14,17-20 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03049870 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,18-20* the whole document * |