EP1860329 - MAGNET-TYPE RODLESS CYLINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Howa Machinery, Ltd. 1900-1, Sukaguchi Kiyosu-shi, Aichi 452-8601 / JP | For all designated states Koganei Corporation 3-11-28, Midori-cho Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8533 / JP | [2012/10] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states Howa Machinery, Ltd. 1900-1, Sukaguchi Kiyosu-shi, Aichi 452-8601 / JP | ||
For all designated states Koganei Corporation 8-16, Iwamotocho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0032 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORIKAWA, Akiyoshi c/o Koganei Corporation 3-11-28, Midori-cho Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184-8533 / JP | 02 /
MINOWA, Naoki c/o Koganei Corporation 3-11-28, Midori-cho Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184-8533 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIDA, Hiroshi c/o Koganei Corporation 3-11-28, Midori-cho Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184-8533 / JP | 04 /
NODA, Mitsuo 23-24, Hanaike 2-chome, Ichinomiya-shi Aichi 491-0914 / JP | [2012/36] |
Former [2012/15] | 01 /
HORIKAWA, Akiyoshi c/o Koganei Corporation 3-11-28, Midori-cho Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184-8533 / JP | ||
02 /
MINOVA, Naoki c/o Koganei Corporation 3-11-28, Midori-cho Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184-8533 / JP | |||
03 /
YOSHIDA, Hiroshi c/o Koganei Corporation 3-11-28, Midori-cho Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184-8533 / JP | |||
04 /
NODA, Mitsuo 23-24, Hanaike 2-chome, Ichinomiya-shi Aichi 491-0914 / JP | |||
Former [2012/10] | 01 /
Horikawa, Akiyoshi 3-11-28, Midori-cho Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184-8533 / JP | ||
02 /
Minowa, Naoki 3-11-28, Midori-cho Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184-8533 / JP | |||
03 /
Yoshida, Hiroshi 3-11-28, Midori-cho Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184-8533 / JP | |||
04 /
NODA, Mitsuo 23-24, Hanaike 2-chome, Ichinomiya-shi, Aichi 4910914 / JP | |||
Former [2012/08] | 01 /
Horikawa, Akiyoshi c/o Koganei Corporation 8-16, Iwamotocho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1010032 / JP | ||
02 /
Minowa, Naoki c/o Koganei Corporation 8-16, Iwamotocho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1010032 / JP | |||
03 /
Yoshida, Hiroshi c/o Koganei Corporation 8-16, Iwamotocho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1010032 / JP | |||
04 /
NODA, Mitsuo 23-24, Hanaike 2-chome, Ichinomiya-shi, Aichi 4910914 / JP | |||
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
Horikawa, Akiyoshi c/o Koganei Corporation, 8-16, Iwamotocho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1010032 / JP | ||
02 /
Mimowa, Naoki c/o Koganei Corporation, 8-16, Iwamotocho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1010032 / JP | |||
03 /
Yoshida, Hiroshi c/o Koganei Corporation, 8-16, Iwamotocho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1010032 / JP | |||
04 /
NODA, Mitsuo 23-24, Hanaike 2-chome, Ichinomiya-shi, Aichi 4910914 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05811318.4 | 25.11.2005 | [2007/48] | WO2005JP22133 | Priority number, date | JP20050073518 | 15.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005073518 | [2007/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006098062 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1860329 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1860329 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1860329 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/14 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
F15B15/1447 (EP,US);
F15B15/14 (KR);
F15B15/086 (EP,US);
F15B15/1466 (EP,US);
Y10S91/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/16] |
Former [2007/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KOLBENSTANGELOSER MAGNETZYLINDER | [2007/48] | English: | MAGNET-TYPE RODLESS CYLINDER | [2007/48] | French: | CYLINDRE SANS TIGE DE TYPE A AIMANT | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2007 | Translation filed | 14.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 16.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH0344213U (UNKNOWN) [AD] 1 * figures 1-2 *; | [A]DE29815317U (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * page 11, paragraphs 2,3 * | International search | [X]JPH11336708 (CKD CORP); | [A]JP2514499Y ; | [A]JPS60172711 (ORIGA GMBH PUNOIMATEIKU) | by applicant | JPH04113305U | JPH04357310 | JP2514499Y | JPS60172711 | US3893378 | JPH09217708 |