EP1828122 - N-PYRROLIDIN-3-YL-AMIDE DERIVATIVES AS SEROTONIN AND NORADRENALIN RE-UPTAKE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDREWS, Mark David Pfizer Global Res. & Dev. Ramsgate Road, Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 02 /
BROWN, Alan Daniel Pfizer Global Res. & Dev. Ramsgate Road, Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 03 /
FISH, Paul Vincent Pfizer Global Res. & Dev. Ramsgsgate Road, Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 04 /
FRAY, Michael Jonathan Pfizer Global Res. & Dev. Ramsgate Road, Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 05 /
LANSDELL, Mark Ian Pfizer Global Res. & Dev. Ramsgate Road, Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 06 /
RYCKMANS, Thomas Pfizer Global Res. & Dev. Ramsgate Road, Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 07 /
STOBIE, Alan Pfizer Global Res. & Dev. Ramsgate Road, Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 08 /
WAKENHUT, Florian pfizer Global Res. & Dev. Ramsgate Road, andwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 09 /
GRAY, David L.F. Pfizer Global Res. & Dev. Ann Arbor Laboratories, 2800 Plymouth Road Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Nevant, Marc, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Nevant, Marc, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/20] | Nevant, Marc, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Samdwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / FR | ||
Former [2007/36] | Nevant, Marc, et al Pfizer European Pharma Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05811385.3 | 08.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005IB03791 | Priority number, date | GB20040027618 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: GB 0427618 | US20050647839P | 27.01.2005 Original published format: US 647839 P | US20050695238P | 28.06.2005 Original published format: US 695238 P | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006064351 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1828122 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/34, C07D401/12, C07D211/58, A61K31/40, A61P13/00, A61P25/24, A61P29/00 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
C07D207/14 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | N-PYRROLIDIN-3-YLAMIDDERIVATE ALS SEROTONIN- UND NORADRENALIN-WIEDERAUFNAHMEHEMMER | [2007/36] | English: | N-PYRROLIDIN-3-YL-AMIDE DERIVATIVES AS SEROTONIN AND NORADRENALIN RE-UPTAKE INHIBITORS | [2007/36] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE N-PYRROLIDIN-3-YL-AMIDE COMME INHIBITEURS DE RECAPTAGE DE LA SÉROTONINE ET NORADRÉNALINE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/08] | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3577440 (LUNSFORD CARL DALTON, et al) [X] 1-24 * column 1, paragraph LAST; claim 1 * * tables I,II * * claim 1 *; | [X]EP1125922 (WELFIDE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-24 * page 3, paragraph 1 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2004000808 (ACADIA PHARM INC [US]) [A] 1-24 * claims 1,6-35 *; | [A]US3963745 (CALE JR ALBERT DUNCAN, et al) [A] 1-24 * column 1, lines 49-53 * * claim 1 *; | [A]FR2295744 (ROBINS CO INC A H [US]) [A] 1-24 * page 1, lines 1-5 * * claim 1 * |