EP1841896 - AMORPHOUS CARBON FILM, PROCESS FOR FORMING THE SAME, AND HIGH WEAR-RESISTANT SLIDING MEMBER WITH AMORPHOUS CARBON FILM PROVIDED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/41] | AMORPHOUS CARBON FILM, PROCESS FOR FORMING THE SAME, AND HIGH WEAR-RESISTANT SLIDING MEMBER WITH AMORPHOUS CARBON FILM PROVIDED | ||
[2014/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1 Yokomichi Nagakute-shi, Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | [2014/42] |
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun Aichi-ken, 480-1192 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISEKI, Takashi, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Yokomichi, Nagakute-shi Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | 02 /
TACHIKAWA, Hideo, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Yokomichi, Nagakute-shi Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | 03 /
MORI, Hiroyuki, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Yokomichi, Nagakute-shi Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | 04 /
NAKANISHI, Kazuyuki, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENK. 41-1, Yokomichi, Nagakute-shi Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | 05 /
MATSUI, Munehisa, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Yokomichi, Nagakute-shi Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | 06 /
IGARASHI, Shintaro, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHU KENKYUSHO 41-1, Yokomichi, Nagakute-shi Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | 07 /
SHIMIZU, Fumio, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Yokomichi, Nagakute-shi Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | 08 /
TSUCHIYA, Yoshinari, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENK. 41-1, Yokomichi, Nagakute-shi Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | 09 /
OSHIMA, Tadashi, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Yokomichi, Nagakute-shi Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | [2014/45] |
Former [2007/41] | 01 /
ISEKI, Takashi, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute, Nagake-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi 4801192 / JP | ||
02 /
TACHIKAWA, Hideo, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi 4801192 / JP | |||
03 /
MORI, Hiroyuki, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi 4801192 / JP | |||
04 /
NAKANISHI, Kazuyuki, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENK. 41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi 4801192 / JP | |||
05 /
MATSUI, Munehisa, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi 4801192 / JP | |||
06 /
IGARASHI, Shintaro, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHU KENKYUSHO 41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi 4801192 / JP | |||
07 /
SHIMIZU, Fumio, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi 4801192 / JP | |||
08 /
TSUCHIYA, Yoshinari, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENK. 41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi 4801192 / JP | |||
09 /
OSHIMA, Tadashi, c/o K. K. TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1,Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi 4801192 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05811509.8 | 24.11.2005 | [2014/45] | WO2005JP22044 | Priority number, date | JP20040340846 | 25.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004340846 | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006057436 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1841896 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1841896 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/22, C23C16/26, C23C16/30, C23C16/50, C23C16/503, C23C16/02 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
C23C16/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2008/10] |
Former [2007/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FILM AUS AMORPHEM KOHLENSTOFF, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND HOCHVERSCHLEISSFESTES GLEITELEMENT MIT FILM AUS AMORPHEM KOHLENSTOFF | [2014/45] | English: | AMORPHOUS CARBON FILM, PROCESS FOR FORMING THE SAME, AND HIGH WEAR-RESISTANT SLIDING MEMBER WITH AMORPHOUS CARBON FILM PROVIDED | [2014/45] | French: | FILM DE CARBONE AMORPHE, SON PROCEDE DE FORMATION ET ELEMENT COULISSANT A FORTE RESISTANCE A L'USURE EN ETANT FAIT | [2014/45] |
Former [2007/41] | FILM AUS AMORPHEM KOHLENSTOFF, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND HOCHVERSCHLEISSFESTES GLEITELEMENT MIT FILM AUS AMORPHEM KOHLENSTOFF | ||
Former [2007/41] | AMORPHOUS CARBON FILM, PROCESS FOR FORMING THE SAME, AND HIGH WEAR-RESISTANT SLIDING MEMBER WITH AMORPHOUS CARBON FILM PROVIDED | ||
Former [2007/41] | FILM DE CARBONE AMORPHE, SON PROCEDE DE FORMATION ET ELEMENT COULISSANT A FORTE RESISTANCE A L'USURE EN ETANT FAIT | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 29.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0874066 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 3,4 * column 5, line 2 - column 6, line 19 * [A] 1,2,5; | [XA]JPH03240957 ; | [A]JP2003293136 ; | [PXA]EP1486695 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]) [PX] 3,4 * example 8; table 4 * [PA] 1,2,5; | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920124), vol. 016, no. 029, Database accession no. (C - 0904), & JP03240957 A 19911028 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV LAB INC) [X] 3,4 * abstract * [A] 1,2,5 | [XA] - ABBAS G A ET AL, "A study of ta-C, a-C:H and Si-a:C:H thin films on polymer substrates as a gas barrier", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200404), vol. 13, no. 4-8, ISSN 0925-9635, pages 1342 - 1345, XP004507971 [X] 3,4 * page 1342, column RIGHT, paragraph 2 * * page 1345, column LEFT, paragraph 4 * [A] 1,2,5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.diamond.2003.10.084 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003293136 A 20031015 (RIKEN CORP) [A] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [A] - PAPAKONSTANTINOU P ET AL, "The effects of Si incorporation on the electrochemical and nanomechanical properties of DLC thin films", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200203), vol. 11, no. 3-6, ISSN 0925-9635, pages 1074 - 1080, XP004357078 [A] 1-5 * page 1080, column LEFT, paragraph 5; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-9635(01)00656-2 | by applicant | EP0874066 | JPH03240957 | - G.A. ABBAS ET AL., DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, (2004), vol. 13, no. 4-8, pages 1342 - 1345 |