EP1829712 - PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIWAKI, Yukihiro@c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 02 /
WATABE, Ryoichi@c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 03 /
SHIBATA, Kenichi@c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 04 /
TAGAWA, Kazuyoshi@c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2012/24] |
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
KIWAKI, Yukihiro c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | ||
02 /
WATABE, Ryoichi c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIBATA, Kenichi c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | |||
04 /
TAGAWA, Kazuyoshi c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/17] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05811565.0 | 30.11.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005JP21983 | Priority number, date | JP20040345848 | 30.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004345848 | JP20040345851 | 30.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004345851 | JP20040345866 | 30.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004345866 | [2007/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006059640 | Date: | 08.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1829712 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1829712 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/12, B60C11/00 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
B60C11/12 (EP,US);
B60C11/0302 (EP,US);
B60C2011/1213 (EP,US);
B60C2011/1231 (EP,US);
B60C2011/1245 (EP,US);
B60C2011/1277 (EP,US);
Y10S152/03 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2008/10] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LUFTREIFEN | [2007/36] | English: | PNEUMATIC TIRE | [2007/36] | French: | BANDAGE PNEUMATIQUE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2007 | Translation filed | 29.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 30.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH05330319 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [X]JPH07186633 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]JPH09323511 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [A]JP2000025421 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [A]WO2004005051 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XE]EP1625950 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]); | [XE]JP2006051873 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) |