EP1803279 - SECURITY DEVICE FOR AN AUTOCOMMUTATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CheckPhone Technologies 1 bis rue Bartholdi 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2010/04] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states Checkphone 19/21, Rue du Colonel Pierre Avia 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAAS, Gérard 22, allée Antoine de Saint Exupéry F-78480 Verneuil-sur-Seine / FR | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Feray, Valérie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Feray, Valérie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/04] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2007/27] | Gosnall, Toby Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05812485.0 | 19.10.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005FR02601 | Priority number, date | FR20040052361 | 19.10.2004 Original published format: FR 0452361 | [2007/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006042973 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1803279 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04M3/38 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
H04L63/0209 (EP);
H04L63/1408 (EP);
H04M15/00 (EP);
H04M15/47 (EP);
H04M3/38 (EP);
H04L63/1433 (EP);
H04L63/1441 (EP);
H04M2215/0148 (EP);
H04M3/205 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN AUTOKOMMUTATOR | [2007/27] | English: | SECURITY DEVICE FOR AN AUTOCOMMUTATOR | [2007/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SECURISATION D UN AUTOCOMMUTATEUR | [2007/27] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 10.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/41] | 30.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2009 | 22.11.2011 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2011 | 31.10.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 10.01.2008 | [2008/16] | Cited in | International search | [DY]US2004161086 (BUNTIN DAVID L ET AL) [DY] 1-5,8-13,16 * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0045]; figures 1A-1L * * paragraphs [0053] , [0054] * * paragraphs [0070] - [0121] * * paragraph [0154] * * paragraph [0165] * * paragraphs [0172] , [0173] * * paragraph [0187] *; | [Y]US2004111305 (GAVAN JOHN ET AL) [Y] 1-5,8-13,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0093] - [0118] * * paragraph [0125]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0232] * * paragraphs [0244] - [0252] *; | [Y]US6801607 (MARCHAND DEAN C ET AL) [Y] 1-3,8-11,16 * abstract * * column 1, line 47 - column 3, line 59 * * column 5, lines 3-65 *; | [A]WO03009573 (SECURELOGIX CORPORATION) [A] 1,3,5,6,8,11,12,15,16 * paragraphs [0058] - [0063] * * paragraph [0200] * * paragraphs [0204] - [0207] *; | [A]US2001014150 (BEEBE TODD ET AL) [A] 1,3,5,6,8,11,14-16 * paragraphs [0014] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0059] - [0079] * |