EP1771435 - MODULATORS OF CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM NEUROTRANSMITTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Human Biomolecular Research Institute 5310 Eastgate Mall San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASHMAN, John R. 5310 Eastgate Mall San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/13] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/43] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/15] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 11 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05812931.3 | 20.06.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005US21818 | Priority number, date | US20040581210P | 19.06.2004 Original published format: US 581210 P | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006025920 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1771435 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/00, C07D317/00, A01N43/08, C07D405/04, C07D405/06, C07D323/02, A61K31/341, A61P25/22, A61P25/24 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
C07D307/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/06 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
C07D237/32 (US);
|
Former IPC [2007/15] | C07D323/02, C07D307/00, C07D317/00, A01N43/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | 15.01.2007 | BA | 15.01.2007 | HR | 15.01.2007 | LV | 15.01.2007 | MK | 15.01.2007 | YU | 15.01.2007 | Title | German: | MODULATOREN VON NEUROTRANSMITTERN DES ZENTRALEN NERVENSYSTEMS | [2007/15] | English: | MODULATORS OF CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM NEUROTRANSMITTERS | [2007/15] | French: | MODULATEURS DE NEUROTRANSMETTEURS DU SYSTEME NERVEUX CENTRAL | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 22.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 03.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.12.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 19.12.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.01.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2857397 (COPE ARTHUR C) [X] 1,2 * column 1 - column 2 *; | [X]EP0158922 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * claim - *; | [X]EP0289913 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,15,16 * examples 206-218,266; claim - *; | [X]GB2268742 (SCRAS [FR]) [X] 1-3,15,16 * claim 21 *; | [X]US6121307 (MEWSHAW RICHARD E [US], et al) [X] 13,15,16 * column 0; claim - *; | [E]WO2005066162 (HUMAN BIOMOLECULAR RES INST [US], et al) [E] 1,2,15,16 * claim 13; tables 9,10; compounds 2,16,29,38 *; | [X] - ROBINS M J ET AL, "Nucleic acid related compounds. 114. Synthesis of 2,6-(disubstituted)purine 2',3'-dideoxynucleosides and selected cytotoxic, anti-hepatitis B and adenosine deaminase substrate activities", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, HETERO CORP., TAMPA, FL, US, (200111), vol. 38, ISSN 0022-152X, pages 1297 - 1306, XP002952782 [X] 1,13 * compound 6C * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570380609 | [X] - SH. HARUSAWA ET AL., "synthesis of 4(5)-[5-(aminomethyl)tetrahydrofuran-2-yl- or 5-(aminomethyl)-2,5-dihydrofuran-2-yl]imidazoles by efficient use of a phse group:", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., USAMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON., (1999), vol. 64, no. 23, pages 8608 - 8615, XP002463054 [X] 1,13,16 * page 8606 - page 8607 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo9910637 | [X] - A. COPE, "preparation and reactions of quaternary ammonium salts derived from cis-2,5-bis-hydroxymethyl-tetrahydrofuran ditosylate.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., USAMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC., (19590905), vol. 81, pages 4577 - 4583, XP002463055 [X] 1,2 * page 4577 - page 4578; compounds VIII, X * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01526a035 | [X] - ROBINSON, ROBERT ET AL, ".beta.-Phenylfurylethylamine and analogous derivatives of thiophene and pyrrole", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1940:6253, URL: STN, XP002463056 [X] 1,5 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5010060 (LAMBERT ROBERT W [GB], et al); | [X]US5583147 (KO SOO S [US], et al); | [X]WO9706178 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [X]US6472384 (INUKAI MASATOSHI [JP], et al); | [X] - RICHTER ET AL., "The Coordination of 5'-derivatives of adenosine to vanadate", INORGANICA CHIMICA, (1995), vol. 238, no. 1-2, pages 155 - 158, XP003001049 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0020-1693(95)04700-J | [X] - BARALDI ET AL., "Novel N6-(Substituted-phenylcarbamoyl) adenosine-5'-uronamides as Potent Agonists for A3 Adenosine Receptors", J. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, pages 802 - 806, XP002913657 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm950518r | Examination | US6121307 |