EP1824668 - MACHINE AND METHOD FOR FORMING TUBES BY HELICAL WINDING OF STRIPS OF WEB MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FABIO PERINI S.p.A. Via per Mugnano 55100 Lucca / IT | [2008/14] |
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states FABIO PERINI S.p.A. Via per Mugnano I-55100 Lucca / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELLI, Mauro Via del Marginone, 24 Fraz. Pieve S. Paolo 55066 Capannori / IT | 02 /
CICALINI, Giancarlo Via del Molino, 45B 55062 Castelvecchio di Compito / IT | 03 /
MAZZACCHERINI, Graziano Via Romana Est, 119 55016 Porcari / IT | [2008/14] |
Former [2007/35] | 01 /
GELLI, Mauro Via del Marginone 24, Fraz. Pieve S. Paolo I-55066 Capannori / IT | ||
02 /
CICALINI, Giancarlo Via del Molino 45B I-55062 Castelvecchio di Compito / IT | |||
03 /
MAZZACCHERINI, Graziano Via Romana Est 119 I-55016 Porcari / IT | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing. A. Mannucci S.r.l. Via della Scala, 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/35] | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing. A. Mannucci S.r.l. Via della Scala, 4 50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 05813232.5 | 18.11.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005IT00672 | Priority number, date | IT2004FI00241 | 22.11.2004 Original published format: IT FI20040241 | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006054327 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1824668 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1824668 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B31C3/00 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
B31C3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ROHREN DURCH SCHRAUBENFÖRMIGE WICKLUNG VON BAHNMATERIALSTREIFEN | [2007/35] | English: | MACHINE AND METHOD FOR FORMING TUBES BY HELICAL WINDING OF STRIPS OF WEB MATERIAL | [2007/35] | French: | MACHINE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MOULAGE DE TUBES PAR ENROULEMENT HÉLICOÏDAL DE BANDES DE MATÉRIAU TISSÉ | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 23.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.04.2008 | BE | 02.04.2008 | CY | 02.04.2008 | CZ | 02.04.2008 | DK | 02.04.2008 | EE | 02.04.2008 | FI | 02.04.2008 | IT | 02.04.2008 | LT | 02.04.2008 | LV | 02.04.2008 | NL | 02.04.2008 | PL | 02.04.2008 | RO | 02.04.2008 | SI | 02.04.2008 | SK | 02.04.2008 | TR | 02.04.2008 | BG | 02.07.2008 | SE | 02.07.2008 | GR | 03.07.2008 | IS | 02.08.2008 | PT | 04.09.2008 | HU | 03.10.2008 | IE | 18.11.2008 | LU | 18.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
TR | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
HU | 03.10.2008 | ||
IE | 18.11.2008 | ||
LU | 18.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
IE | 18.11.2008 | ||
LU | 18.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
IE | 18.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 02.04.2008 | |
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 02.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2785700 (YOVANOVICH JOSEPH T) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 1 - line 41; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE19707407 (BRODBECK MASCHB GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-9 * column 3, line 50 - line 61; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 51 - column 7, line 33 *; | [DA]US5989370 (WANNEBO ANDREAS [SE]) [DA] 5,10* column 1, line 25 - line 29; figure 1 *; | [X]US2004163725 (PIERCE PETER D [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0034]; figures 5,6 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0069] * |