EP1961245 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TANDEM FREE OPERATION SIGNAL TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR Updated state(s): BE | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | 08.07.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L- M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGNONI, Francesco Vicolo Tempio d'Ercole, 3 I-04010 CORI / IT | 02 /
CALZOLARI, Maddalena Via Pietro Brazza, 53 I-06127 PERUGIA / IT | 03 /
FRANCO, Andrea Via Luigi Rizzo, 72 I-00136 ROMA / IT | 04 /
QUAGLIANI, Massimo Via J.F. Kennedy, 87 I-00040 MARINO / IT | 05 /
SPALLACCINI, Paolo Via Perugia, 31 I-05010 MONTEGABBIONE / IT | 06 /
TERZANI, Alessio Via Francesco Grimaldi, 141 I-00146 ROMA / IT | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Pfeifer, Torsten, et al Ericsson GmbH Patent Department Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Pfeifer, Torsten, et al Ericsson GmbH Patent Department Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Pfeifer, Torsten, et al Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 D-52134 Herzogenrath / DE | Application number, filing date | 05813313.3 | 30.11.2005 | [2008/35] | WO2005EP56362 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007062687 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1961245 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1961245 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/18 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
H04W88/181 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/35] | H04Q7/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNG MIT TANDEMFREIEM BETRIEB | [2008/35] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TANDEM FREE OPERATION SIGNAL TRANSMISSION | [2008/35] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX SANS FONCTIONNEMENT EN TANDEM | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 22.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 02.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 02.07.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.07.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 06.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.12.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2005 | AT | 13.08.2014 | BE | 13.08.2014 | CY | 13.08.2014 | CZ | 13.08.2014 | DK | 13.08.2014 | EE | 13.08.2014 | FI | 13.08.2014 | IT | 13.08.2014 | LT | 13.08.2014 | LV | 13.08.2014 | MC | 13.08.2014 | NL | 13.08.2014 | PL | 13.08.2014 | RO | 13.08.2014 | SE | 13.08.2014 | SI | 13.08.2014 | SK | 13.08.2014 | TR | 13.08.2014 | BG | 13.11.2014 | GR | 14.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | IE | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | LU | 30.11.2014 | FR | 01.12.2014 | IS | 13.12.2014 | PT | 15.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/50] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 13.08.2014 | |
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 13.08.2014 | |
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 13.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6108560 (NAVARRO WILLIAM [FR], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 1, line 4 - line 7 * * column 6, line 11 - column 8, line 4 * * column 12, line 11 - line 12 * * column 13, line 48 - line 61 * * column 16, line 47 - column 17, line 16 * * column 18, line 14 - line 25 * * figures 5,7a,7b,10 *; | [A]US2003035501 (HOPPES BRIAN R [US]) [A] 1,8,9,16-19 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A]EP1225773 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,8,9,16-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraphs [0027] , [0031] * * figures 1,4a * | [X] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Inband Tandem Free Operation (TFO) of speech codecs; Service description; Stage 3 (3GPP TS 28.062 version 5.4.0 Release 5); ETSI TS 128 062", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200309), vol. 3-SA4, no. V540, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014017023 [X] 1-7,9-15,18 * page 36, paragraph 7 - page 37, paragraph 7 * * page 43, paragraph 7.10 - page 44, paragraph 7.10 * * page 54, paragraph 9 * * page 57, paragraphs 9.5,9.7.1 * * page 117, paragraph C.2.1 * * page 120, paragraph C.3 - page 121, paragraph C.3 * * page 125, paragraph C.3.3 * * page 126, paragraph C.3.4.1 - page 127, paragraph C.3.4.1 * * figures 4.2.1-1,9-1,C.3-1 * | by applicant | US6108560 |