|
25.10.2017 |
Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2017 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2017 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
15.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
18.09.2007 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2007 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2007 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.04.2007 |
Communication regarding Amendments not taken into account |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
13.04.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
13.04.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.04.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.04.2007 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
13 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
45 |