27.10.2017 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
20.10.2017 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
28.07.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
10.05.2017 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
23.12.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.10.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.06.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.06.2015 |
First examination report |
|
24.12.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.04.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
03.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
21.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.06.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
14.03.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
21.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.08.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |
24.08.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |
19.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|