Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006072516 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005001149 | 10.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1836789 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005001149 | 10.01.2005 | DE102005005695 | 08.02.2005 | WO2005EP56438 | 02.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102005001149 | 20.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005001149 | 10.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102005005695 | 28.03.2019 | B4 | DE102005005695 | 17.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005005695 | 08.02.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006072517 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005001149 | 10.01.2005 | DE102005005695 | 08.02.2005 |