EP1831581 - WHEEL-GUIDING PNEUMATIC SPRING AND DAMPER UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Str. 9 D-30165 Hannover / DE | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLEU, Jens-Uwe Neue Wiesen 1 30855 Langenhagen / DE | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Finger, Karsten Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Finger, Karsten Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 05813384.4 | 29.11.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005EP12713 | Priority number, date | DE20041059765 | 11.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004059765 | [2007/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006061119 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1831581 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1831581 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/05 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
F16F9/055 (EP,US);
F16F9/05 (KR);
F16F9/02 (KR);
B60G2200/142 (EP,US);
B60G2202/152 (EP,US);
B60G2202/242 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADFÜHRENDE LUFTFEDER- UND DÄMPFEREINHEIT | [2007/37] | English: | WHEEL-GUIDING PNEUMATIC SPRING AND DAMPER UNIT | [2007/37] | French: | UNITE RESSORT ET AMORTISSEUR PNEUMATIQUE DE GUIDAGE DE ROUE | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 09.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.03.2008 | CZ | 05.03.2008 | DK | 05.03.2008 | EE | 05.03.2008 | FI | 05.03.2008 | IE | 05.03.2008 | IT | 05.03.2008 | LT | 05.03.2008 | LV | 05.03.2008 | NL | 05.03.2008 | PL | 05.03.2008 | RO | 05.03.2008 | SI | 05.03.2008 | SK | 05.03.2008 | TR | 05.03.2008 | BG | 05.06.2008 | SE | 05.06.2008 | GR | 06.06.2008 | ES | 16.06.2008 | IS | 05.07.2008 | PT | 05.08.2008 | HU | 06.09.2008 | AT | 29.11.2008 | LU | 29.11.2008 | BE | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
TR | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
HU | 06.09.2008 | ||
AT | 29.11.2008 | ||
LU | 29.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
AT | 29.11.2008 | ||
LU | 29.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
AT | 29.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | CZ | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | CZ | 05.03.2008 | |
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 05.03.2008 | |
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
ES | 16.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1132013 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [A] 1* figure 2 *; | [DA]DE2406835 (GOLD HENNING DIPL ING) [DA] 1 * figure 3 *; | [DA]DE10311263 (AUDI AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE2406835 | DE3436664 | US5180145 | DE19932717 | DE10115980 | DE10311263 |