EP1844452 - METHOD FOR QUESTIONING THE SYSTEM CONFIGURATION OF A DATA CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [2007/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEISTER, Gisela Stademannstrasse 11 81737 München / DE | 02 /
SPITZ, Stephan Bahnhofstrasse 75 82284 Grafrath / DE | [2007/42] | Application number, filing date | 05813584.9 | 08.11.2005 | [2007/42] | WO2005EP11946 | Priority number, date | DE20041054068 | 09.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004054068 | [2007/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006050912 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1844452 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
G06F9/44505 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G07F7/084 (EP);
G07F7/1008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ABFRAGEN DER SYSTEMKONFIGURATION EINES DATENTRÄGERS | [2007/42] | English: | METHOD FOR QUESTIONING THE SYSTEM CONFIGURATION OF A DATA CARRIER | [2007/42] | French: | PROCEDE D'INTERROGATION DE LA CONFIGURATION DU SYSTEME D'UN SUPPORT DE DONNEES | [2007/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 18.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/45] | 01.07.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0790551 (KONINKLIJKE KPN N.V) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 3, lines 11-51 * * column 4, lines 12-32 * * column 4, lines 49-56 * * figure - *; | [A]US2003140221 (GARNETT PAUL J) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0038] , [0041] * * figure - *; | [A]WO9504328 (INTELLECT AUSTRALIA PTY. LTD; OLIVER, QUENTIN, REES; BERTINA, JOHANNES) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * claim 23 *; | [A]WO0167240 (SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMES; IKBEL AMOR, MOHAMED; RANGONI, GABRIEL) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [LX] - GLOBALPLATFORM, "globalplatform Card Specification Version 2.1.1", INTERNET ARTICLE, (200303), XP002290114 [LX] 1-11 * the whole document * | [X] - RANKL W., EFFING W., "Smart Card Handbook (3rd Edition) - Smart Card Commands", HANDBOOK, West Sussex, England, (2003), ISBN 0-470-85668-8, XP002365757 [X] 1-11 * page 434 - page 490 * * page 1046 - page 1051 * | [X] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Specification of the Subscriber Identity Module - Mobile Equipment (SIM - ME) interface (GSM 11.11 version 8.2.0 Release 1999); ETSI TS 100 977", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200005), vol. 3-T3;SMG9, no. V820, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014005890 [X] 1-11 * pages 38-52 * |