EP1828639 - GEAR PAIR CONSISTING OF A CROWN GEAR AND OF A PINION GEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SONA BLW Präzisionsschmiede GmbH Frankfurter Ring 227 80807 München / DE | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states THYSSENKRUPP PRÄZISIONSSCHMIEDE GMBH Frankfurter Ring 227 80807 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUTMANN, Peter Grimmeisenstrasse 11 81927 München / DE | 02 /
STETTINGER, Heinrich Flurstr. 3 85551 München / DE | 03 /
ZERLING, Frank Schützenstr. 7 85669 Pastetten / DE | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
GUTMANN, Peter Grimmeisenstrasse 11 81927 München / DE | ||
02 /
STETTINGER, Heinrich Johannes Neuhäuslerstr. 5 81929 München / DE | |||
03 /
ZERLING, Frank Schützenstr. 7 85669 Pastetten / DE | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05813775.3 | 09.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005EP13234 | Priority number, date | DE20041062379 | 23.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004062379 | [2007/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006072355 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1828639 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1828639 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16H55/08, F16H48/10 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
F16H55/0846 (EP,US);
F16H55/08 (KR);
F16H1/12 (EP,US);
F16H48/10 (KR);
F16H55/0813 (EP,US);
F16H2055/173 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZAHNRADPAARUNG AUS KRONENRAD UND RITZEL | [2007/36] | English: | GEAR PAIR CONSISTING OF A CROWN GEAR AND OF A PINION GEAR | [2007/36] | French: | ENGRENAGE COMPOSE D'UNE COURONNE DENTEE ET D'UN PIGNON | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 14.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.09.2010 | DK | 22.09.2010 | EE | 22.09.2010 | FI | 22.09.2010 | IE | 22.09.2010 | LT | 22.09.2010 | LV | 22.09.2010 | PL | 22.09.2010 | RO | 22.09.2010 | LU | 09.12.2010 | BG | 22.12.2010 | GR | 23.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | ES | 02.01.2011 | IS | 22.01.2011 | PT | 24.01.2011 | HU | 23.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/44] | BG | 22.09.2010 | |
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
LU | 09.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
HU | 23.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 22.09.2010 | |
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
HU | 23.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 22.09.2010 | |
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 22.09.2010 | |
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | DK | 22.09.2010 | |
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | EE | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | EE | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | EE | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | EE | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | FI | 22.09.2010 | |
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | FI | 22.09.2010 | |
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | FI | 22.09.2010 | |
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | LT | 22.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS63180766 ; | [A]US2313183 (NIKOLA TRBOJEVICH) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 2; figure 10 *; | [A]US4744263 (KUIKEN HENDRIK [NL]) [A] 1,5,7,11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0271844 (POLITECHNIKA RZESZOWSKA [PL], et al) [A] 5,10 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5845533 (BASSTEIN AUGUSTINUS F H [NL], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 49-60; figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [AD]DE10147681 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [AD] 1,5,12-15 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO2004099649 (ASS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,6* page 5, lines 31-33; figure 3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881129), vol. 012, no. 454, Database accession no. (M - 769), & JP63180766 A 19880725 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |