EP1959656 - MOBILE TERMINAL DEVICE, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, METHOD OF CONTROLLING ELECTRIC POWER AND ELECTRIC POWER CONTROL PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIBA, Toshiharu c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
TSUBOYA, Kenichi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
SATOH, Kazutaka c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
DOHI, Yasushi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Sunderland, James Harry Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Sunderland, James Harry Haseltine Lake Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05814189.6 | 07.12.2005 | [2008/34] | WO2005JP22480 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007066393 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1959656 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/73, H04B7/26, H04Q7/38 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
H04W52/0225 (EP,US);
H04M1/72418 (EP,US);
H04W52/0251 (EP,US);
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
H04W52/027 (EP,US);
H04W76/50 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/02] |
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILES ENDGERÄT, KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEM STROM UND ELEKTRISCHES STROMSTEUERPROGRAMM | [2008/34] | English: | MOBILE TERMINAL DEVICE, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, METHOD OF CONTROLLING ELECTRIC POWER AND ELECTRIC POWER CONTROL PROGRAM | [2008/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TERMINAL MOBILE, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2008 | Translation filed | 29.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 08.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/01] | 04.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2004048619 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11112695 (SAEGUSA TAKAO) | by applicant | JP2004246811 | JP2004080540 | JP2004261430 | JP2004169013 | JP2004285190 |