EP1833081 - EXPOSURE APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | 10.12.2010 | Change - inventor | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION Fuji Building, 2-3 Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8831 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Chiaki c/o Nikon Corporation Intellectual Property Department 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008331 / JP | [2011/02] |
Former [2007/37] | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Chiaki c/o NIKON CORPORATION Intellectual Property Department 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008331 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05814498.1 | 06.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005JP22371 | Priority number, date | JP20040353948 | 07.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004353948 | [2007/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006062096 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1833081 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/027, G03F7/20 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
G03F7/70341 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/2041 (KR);
G03F7/70525 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/708 (EP,US);
G03F7/70808 (KR);
G03F7/7085 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BAUELEMENTEHERSTELLUNG | [2007/37] | English: | EXPOSURE APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DEVICE | [2007/37] | French: | APPAREIL D'EXPOSITION ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIF | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2007 | Translation filed | 18.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 30.11.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1420299 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL]); | [X]US2004103950 (IRIGUCHI CHIHARU [JP]); | [Y]US2004117056 (ABUKU YUJI [JP]); | [XP]EP1528431 (NIKON CORP [JP]); | [E]EP1653501 (NIKON CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2004198430 (ASML HOLDING NV); | [A]JP2004207696 (NIKON CORP); | [XP]JP2005159322 (NIKON CORP); | [AP]JP2005259789 (NIKON CORP); | [XP]JP2005268742 (NIKON CORP); | [XE]WO2006013806 (NIKON CORP [JP], et al) |