EP1820418 - STICK COSMETIC ADVANCING CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY, LTD. 5-5, Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | [2019/18] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY, LTD. 5-5 Ginza 7-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NASU, Mieko c/o SHISEIDO Research Center (SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-1, Hayabuchi 2-chome, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | [2019/39] |
Former [2007/34] | 01 /
NASU, Mieko c/o SHISEIDO Res. Ctr. (SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-1, Hayabuchi 2-chome, Tsuzuki-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2019/39] |
Former [2007/34] | Urner, Peter TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05814508.7 | 09.12.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005JP22665 | Priority number, date | JP20040357020 | 09.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004357020 | [2007/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006062192 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1820418 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1820418 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/04 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
A45D40/04 (EP,KR,US);
A45D40/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2019/39] |
Former [2008/04] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2007/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER ZUM VORWÄRTSSCHIEBEN EINES STANGENFÖRMIGEN KOSMETIKARTIKELS | [2007/34] | English: | STICK COSMETIC ADVANCING CONTAINER | [2007/34] | French: | RECEPTACLE D'AVANCE DE BATON COSMETIQUE | [2019/18] |
Former [2007/34] | RECEPTACLE D'AVANCEE DE BATON COSMETIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2007 | Translation filed | 24.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.04.2019 | 02.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5018892 (KRUECKEL PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 59; figure 2 * [Y] 2,3 [I] 6; | [Y]US5085352 (SASAKI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3 * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 29; figures 1,4,5 *; | [XI]DE3835679 (FABER CASTELL A W [DE]) [X] 1,4,5 * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 59; figures 1,2 * [I] 6; | [XI]US3219044 (GORDON BAU ROBERT) [X] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 50; figures 1-8 * [I] 6 | International search | [A]JP2002355118 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD); | [A]JPH02142674U ; | [A]US5813421 (WANG CHUN TE [TW]); | [A]FR728208 | Examination | US2457342 |