18.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
10.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] |
12.03.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] |
27.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
03.04.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
30.03.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
30.03.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.08.2008 |
First examination report |
|
30.07.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.05.2008 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
02.05.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
15.02.2008 |
Change - designated states |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
15.02.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
11.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.07.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] |
20.07.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] |
04.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|