EP1691571 - LOUDSPEAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, GB | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNAHASHI, Osamu @Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg, 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Seiichi @Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg, 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
ANDO, Kimihiro @Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg, 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 04 /
UMEMURA, Kazuyoshi@Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg, 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 05 /
ASAHI, Yoichi @Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg, 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2013/44] |
Former [2006/33] | 01 /
FUNAHASHI, Osamu Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg, 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | ||
02 /
YOSHIDA, Seiichi Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg, 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | |||
03 /
ANDO, Kimihiro Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg, 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | |||
04 /
UMEMURA, Kazuyoshi Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg, 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | |||
05 /
ASAHI, Yoichi Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg, 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [2013/44] |
Former [2006/33] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 05814753.9 | 09.12.2005 | [2006/33] | WO2005JP22641 | Priority number, date | JP20040361167 | 14.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004361167 | [2006/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006064725 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1691571 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1691571 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/02, H04R7/22 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
H04R9/025 (EP,KR,US);
H04R9/022 (EP,KR,US);
H04R9/043 (EP);
H04R2201/34 (EP,KR,US);
H04R2400/11 (EP,KR,US);
H04R2499/13 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/12] |
Former [2006/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LAUTSPRECHER | [2006/33] | English: | LOUDSPEAKER | [2006/33] | French: | HAUT-PARLEUR | [2006/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2006 | Translation filed | 06.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 24.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.04.2013 | 11.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.10.2013 | FR | 31.12.2013 | GB | 30.01.2014 | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/38] | IT | 30.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0847072 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004]; figure 4 *; | [XY]JPH09215090 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC) [X] 1,2,9 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014]; figure 2 * [Y] 8; | [X]US2004195039 (SAHYOUN JOSEPH YAACOUB [US]) [X] 1,2,9 * paragraph [0216]; figure 51 *; | [A]JP2004304512 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 9* abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS33514Y ; | [Y]JPS5866794U ; | [Y]JPS5848871Y ; | [A]JPS6137692U ; | [Y]JPS61104698U ; | [A]JPH0518198U ; | [Y]JP2004350317 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |