EP1768209 - LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKURA, Kensuke, MATSHUSHITA ELECTIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD, 19F Matsushita IMP BLDG, 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
SHIMADA, Mikinari, MATSHUSHITA ELECTIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD, 19F Matsushita IMP BLDG, 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05814783.6 | 12.12.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005JP22808 | Priority number, date | JP20040359419 | 13.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004359419 | [2007/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006064775 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1768209 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1768209 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/40, H01M2/16, H01M4/02 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/414 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/62 (KR);
H01M50/423 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/449 (EP,US);
H01M50/46 (EP,US);
H01M50/489 (EP,US);
H01M50/491 (KR);
H01M10/0587 (EP,US);
H01M10/4235 (EP,US);
H01M2004/027 (KR);
H01M2004/028 (KR);
H01M2300/0017 (KR);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/133 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/12] |
Former [2007/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LITHIUMIONEN-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2007/13] | English: | LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY | [2007/13] | French: | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM-ION | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2007 | Translation filed | 03.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 20.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH07220759 (SONY CORP) [DA] 1-5 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0066] *; | [Y]JPH09190814 (SONY CORP) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] *; | [A]JPH09237622 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0019] ** figures 1,5,6 *; | [Y]JP2000100408 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] *; | [A]EP1184917 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0055]; example 1 * | International search | [A]JPH10294100 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]JPH11102730 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2000100408 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [AP]JP2005259639 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [AP]JP2005302634 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |