EP1809248 - PROCESS FOR GRANULATING PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | For all designated states Merck Canada Inc. 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland, QC H9H 3L1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
For all designated states Merck Canada Inc. 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland, QC H9H 3L1 / CA | |||
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Schering Corporation 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
For all designated states Merck Canada Inc. 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland, QC H9H 3L1 / CA | |||
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | ||
For all designated states Merck Canada Inc. 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland, QC H9H 3L1 / CA | |||
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | ||
For all designated states Merck Canada Inc. 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland, QC H94 3L1 / CA | |||
Former [2011/21] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | ||
For all designated states Merck Canada Inc. 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirland QC H9H 3L1 / CA | |||
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | ||
For all designated states Merck Frosst Canada Ltd. 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland, Québec H9H 3L1 / CA | |||
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
For all designated states Merck Frosst Canada Ltd. 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland, Québec H9H 3L1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HO, Jennifer, S. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
DUMONT, Hubert 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland, Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | 03 /
MANCINELLI, Christopher 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 04 /
SHELUKAR, Suhas, D. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05815344.6 | 31.10.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005US39238 | Priority number, date | US20040624977P | 04.11.2004 Original published format: US 624977 P | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006052503 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1809248 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K9/50, A61K9/22, A61K9/26, B05D7/00 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
B01J2/16 (EP,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US);
A61K9/2081 (EP,US);
A61K9/5026 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM GRANULIEREN VON PARTIKELN | [2007/30] | English: | PROCESS FOR GRANULATING PARTICLES | [2007/30] | French: | PROCEDE DE GRANULATION DE PARTICULES | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 05.11.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3089824 (WURSTER DALE E); | [X]US4182778 (HALL HARLAN S [US], et al); | [Y]US4828746 (CLAUSS ALLEN D [US], et al); | [Y]US5160742 (MAZER TERRENCE B [US], et al) |