EP1802783 - COATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/27] | NANOSTRUCTURED COATING AND COATING METHOD | ||
[2011/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2012/12] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALLE, Karine 59 rue Origet F-37000 TOURS / FR | 02 /
BELLEVILLE, Philippe 25 rue Charles Gille F-37000 TOURS / FR | 03 /
WITTMANN-TENEZE, Karine 8 rue Hector Berlioz F-37260 Monts / FR | 04 /
BIANCHI, Luc 2 rue Fontaine Sainte F-37260 ARTANNES SUR INDRE / FR | 05 /
BLEIN, Franck 4 allée Saint Vincent F-37550 SAINT AVERTIN / FR | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/27] | 01 /
VALLE, Karine 59 rue Origet F-37000 TOURS / FR | ||
02 /
BELLEVILLE, Philippe 25 rue Charles Gille F-37000 TOURS / FR | |||
03 /
WITTMANN-TENEZE, Karine 71 rue de la Fontaine Blanche F-37170 CHAMBRAY-LES-TOURS / FR | |||
04 /
BIANCHI, Luc 2 rue Fontaine Sainte F-37260 ARTANNES SUR INDRE / FR | |||
05 /
BLEIN, Franck 4 allée Saint Vincent F-37550 SAINT AVERTIN / FR | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [2012/12] |
Former [2010/34] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/34] | Poulin, Gérard BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/34] | Poulin, Gérard Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/27] | Poulin, Gérard Société BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05815486.5 | 20.10.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005FR50870 | Priority number, date | FR20040052390 | 21.10.2004 Original published format: FR 0452390 | [2007/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006043006 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1802783 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1802783 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/12 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
C23C4/123 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/27] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN | [2011/41] | English: | COATING METHOD | [2011/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE REVÊTEMENT | [2011/41] |
Former [2007/27] | NANOSTRUKTURIERTE BESCHICHTUNG UND BESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2007/27] | NANOSTRUCTURED COATING AND COATING METHOD | ||
Former [2007/27] | REVETEMENT NANOSTRUCTURE ET PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.09.2011 | 07.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2005 | AT | 21.03.2012 | CY | 21.03.2012 | CZ | 21.03.2012 | DK | 21.03.2012 | EE | 21.03.2012 | FI | 21.03.2012 | LT | 21.03.2012 | LV | 21.03.2012 | NL | 21.03.2012 | PL | 21.03.2012 | RO | 21.03.2012 | SE | 21.03.2012 | SI | 21.03.2012 | SK | 21.03.2012 | TR | 21.03.2012 | BG | 21.06.2012 | GR | 22.06.2012 | IS | 21.07.2012 | PT | 23.07.2012 | IE | 20.10.2012 | LU | 20.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 20.10.2012 | ||
LU | 20.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 20.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 20.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 21.03.2012 | |
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 21.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9718341 (UNIV CONNECTICUT [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * figures 1-5; claims 1-30 *; | [X]EP1134302 (CONSORZIO INTERUNIVERSITARIO P [IT]) [X] 1-38 * claims 1-13 *; | [X]US6447848 (CHOW GAN-MOOG [SG], et al) [X] 1-38 * figure 1; claims 1-16 *; | [X]US2003077398 (STRUTT PETER R [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * claims 1-16 *; | [X] - S. JIANSIRISOMBOON, "LOW PRESSURE PLASMA-SPRAYED AL2O3 AND AL2O3/SIC NANOCOMPOSITE COATINGS FROM DIFFERENT FEEDSTOC POWDERS", JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, (2003), vol. 23, pages 961 - 976, XP004402758 [X] 1-38 * page 961 - page 963 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0955-2219(02)00207-8 | [X] - JIANSIRISOMBOON S ET AL, "LOW PRESSURE PLASMA SPRAYING OF SOL-GEL AL2O3/SIC NANOCOMPOSITE COATINGS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL THERMAL SPRAY CONFERENCE, (20010528), pages 389 - 397, XP008019574 [X] 1-38 * page 389 - page 390 * | Examination | EP0777759 | by applicant | EP1134302 |