EP1805404 - METHOD FOR MONITORING A CONTROL CIRCUIT AND ACTUATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACUA, Eugenio C/ IRUNLARREA n 5 1 Ä Esc. Dcha E-31008 PAMPLONA / ES | 02 /
Ripoll, Christophe 38, rue Rieussec, Bât. 3 appt 120 F-78220 VIROFLAY / FR | [2007/28] | Application number, filing date | 05815531.8 | 18.10.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005FR50861 | Priority number, date | FR20040011007 | 18.10.2004 Original published format: FR 0411007 | [2007/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006042998 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1805404 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/20, H01L41/04, H01F7/18 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
F02D41/20 (EP,KR,US);
H01F7/18 (KR);
H10N30/80 (KR);
H10N35/80 (EP,US);
F02D2041/2072 (EP,US);
H01F7/1844 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERWACHEN EINER STEUERSCHALTUNG UND EINER BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2007/28] | English: | METHOD FOR MONITORING A CONTROL CIRCUIT AND ACTUATING DEVICE | [2007/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE PILOTAGE D'UN CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/27] | 25.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5045766 (VERMERSCH ALAIN [FR]); | [Y]DE10232742 (INA SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]); | [DA]FR2846808 (RENAULT SA [FR]) |