EP1831107 - FINE LEAD-ZIRKONIUM-TITANATES AND ZIRCONIUM-TITANATES AND METHOD OF PRODUCTION USING TITANIUMDIOXIDE HYDRATE PARTICLES WITH A SPECIFIC SURFACE >50 M^2/G [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/37] | FINE-PARTICULATE LEAD ZIRCONIUM TITANATES ZIRCONIUM TITANATE HYDRATES AND ZIRCONIUM TITANATES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
[2017/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Venator Uerdingen GmbH Rheinuferstrasse 7-9 47829 Krefeld / DE | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/26] | For all designated states Sachtleben Pigment GmbH Rheinuferstrasse 7-9 47829 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states Sachtleben Pigment GmbH Rheinuferstrasse 7-9 47829 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states crenox GmbH Rheinuferstrasse 7-9 47829 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states Tronox Pigments GmbH Rheinuferstrasse 7-9 47829 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUER, Gerhard Bodelschwinghstrasse 27 47800 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
GÜNNEL, Horst Bartzheide 67 47906 Kempen / DE | 03 /
Hipler Frank Schimmelreiterweg 20 41339 DORTMUND / DE | 04 /
HOFFMANN, Michael J. Märchenring 23 76199 KARLSRUHE / DE | 05 /
WAGNER, Susanne Kleinbachstrasse 1 76227 KARLSRUHE / DE | 06 /
KUNGL, Hans Rosensteige 2 69118 HEIDELBERG / DE | [2007/40] |
Former [2007/38] | 01 /
AUER, Gerhard Bethelstrasse 20 47800 Krefeld / DE | ||
02 /
GÜNNEL, Horst Bartzheide 67 47906 Kempen / DE | |||
03 /
Hipler Frank Schimmelreiterweg 20 41339 DORTMUND / DE | |||
04 /
HOFFMANN, Michael J. Märchenring 23 76199 KARLSRUHE / DE | |||
05 /
WAGNER, Susanne Kleinbachstrasse 1 76227 KARLSRUHE / DE | |||
06 /
KUNGL, Hans Rosensteige 2 69118 HEIDELBERG / DE | |||
Former [2007/37] | 01 /
AUER, Gerhard Bethelstrasse 20 47800 Krefeld / DE | ||
02 /
GÜNNEL, Horst Bartzheide 67 47906 Kempen / DE | |||
03 /
HILPER, Frank Schimmelreiterweg 20 41339 DORTMUND / DE | |||
04 /
HOFFMANN, Michael J. Märchenring 23 76199 KARLSRUHE / DE | |||
05 /
WAGNER, Susanne Kleinbachstrasse 1 76227 KARLSRUHE / DE | |||
06 /
KUNGL, Hans Rosensteige 2 69118 HEIDELBERG / DE | Representative(s) | Nobbe, Matthias, et al Seyer & Nobbe Patentanwälte Mülheimer Straße 210 47057 Duisburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Nobbe, Matthias, et al Demski & Nobbe Patentanwälte Mülheimer Strasse 210 47057 Duisburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/43] | Nobbe, Matthias, et al Demski, Frank & Nobbe Reichspräsidentenstrasse 21-25 45470 Mülheim / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05815590.4 | 13.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005EP13341 | Priority number, date | EP20040029439 | 13.12.2004 Original published format: EP 04029439 | [2007/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006063784 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1831107 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1831107 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C01G25/00, C04B35/491, B82Y30/00, C04B35/626 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
C01G25/00 (EP,KR,US);
C01G21/00 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01G23/00 (KR);
C01G25/006 (EP,US);
C04B35/491 (EP,US);
C04B35/62615 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3231 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3251 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5409 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/37] | C01G25/00, C04B35/491 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/26] |
Former [2007/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FEINTEILIGE BLEIZIRKONATTITANATE UND ZIRKONIUMTITANATE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON TITANOXIDHYDRATPARTIKELN | [2017/40] | English: | FINE LEAD-ZIRKONIUM-TITANATES AND ZIRCONIUM-TITANATES AND METHOD OF PRODUCTION USING TITANIUMDIOXIDE HYDRATE PARTICLES WITH A SPECIFIC SURFACE >50 M^2/G | [2017/40] | French: | PARTICULES FINES DE TITANATES DE ZIRKONIUM ET DE PLOMB-ZIRKONIUM ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION UTILISANT DES PARTICULES D'HYDRATE D'OXYDE DE TITANIUM AYANT UNE SURFACE > 50M^2/G | [2017/40] |
Former [2007/37] | FEINTEILIGE BLEIZIRKONATTITANATE, ZIRKONTITANHYDRATE UND ZIRKONIUMTITANATE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2007/37] | FINE-PARTICULATE LEAD ZIRCONIUM TITANATES ZIRCONIUM TITANATE HYDRATES AND ZIRCONIUM TITANATES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
Former [2007/37] | TITANATES DE PLOMB-ZIRCONATE, HYDRATES DE ZIRCON-TITANE ET TITANATES DE ZIRCONIUM A FINES PARTICULES ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DESDITES SUBSTANCES | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 18.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.09.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 30.09.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2005 | CY | 27.06.2018 | EE | 27.06.2018 | LT | 27.06.2018 | LV | 27.06.2018 | MC | 27.06.2018 | PT | 27.06.2018 | RO | 27.06.2018 | SK | 27.06.2018 | TR | 27.06.2018 | BG | 27.09.2018 | GR | 28.09.2018 | IS | 27.10.2018 | AT | 13.12.2018 | IE | 13.12.2018 | LU | 13.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 13.12.2005 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
PT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
AT | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
PT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
AT | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/23] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
AT | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | LT | 27.06.2018 | |
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | LT | 27.06.2018 | |
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | LT | 27.06.2018 | |
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | LT | 27.06.2018 | |
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | LT | 27.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO02062724 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) [X] 2 * page 9, line 12 - page 10, line 8; table 1 * * page 11, line 7 - line 15 * * page 12, line 1 - line 22; example 3 * [Y] 1,3-32; | [Y]JPS649819 ; | JPH109818 [ ] (NIKON CORP); | [X]JPH06144835 ; | [Y]US2002135971 (NAKAYA SYUNSUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 5,20 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0015] , [0016] * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890427), vol. 013, no. 182, Database accession no. (C - 591), & JP01009819 A 19890113 (NATL INST FOR RES IN INORG MATER; others: 02) [Y] 1,3-32 * the whole document * | [X] - SHIRASAKI, SHINICHI ET AL, "Manufacture of modified zirconium powder for dielectric ceramic", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 110:224087, URL: STN, XP002336905 [X] 41-44 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940825), vol. 018, no. 456, Database accession no. (C - 1242), & JP06144835 A 19940524 (OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * | [X] - M. OLEDZKA, M. LENCKA, P. PINCELOUP, K. MIKULKA-BOLEN, L. MCCANDLISH, R. RIMAN, "Influence of Precursor on Mikrostructure and Phase Composition of Epitaxial Hydrothermal PbZr0.7Ti0.3O3 Films", CHEM. MATER, (2003), vol. 15, pages 1090 - 1098, XP002369626 [X] 33-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm020063b |