09.01.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] |
31.01.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.08.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
02.08.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
27.06.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.05.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.02.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.08.2012 |
First examination report |
|
08.08.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2008 |
Change - designated states |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
15.02.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
12.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] |
27.07.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
27.07.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
17.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|