EP1824698 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A BRAKING SYSTEM OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/10] |
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÄGER, Markus Zeilsheimer Weg 5 65760 Eschborn / DE | 02 /
SCHMITT, Gregor Luitpoldstrasse 11a 93047 Regensburg / DE | [2007/43] |
Former [2007/35] | 01 /
JÄGER, Markus Zeilsheimer Weg 5 65760 Eschborn / DE | ||
02 /
SCHMITT, Gregor Antoniter Strasse 10 65929 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 05815655.5 | 09.12.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005EP56648 | Priority number, date | DE20041059585 | 09.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004059585 | DE20051059373 | 09.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005059373 | [2007/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006061433 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1824698 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1824698 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/00 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60L7/22 (EP,US);
B60L7/26 (EP,US);
B60T1/10 (EP,US);
B60T13/586 (EP,US);
B60T8/00 (EP,US);
B60T8/267 (EP,US);
B60W10/184 (EP,US);
B60W30/18127 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/35] | B60K6/04, B60T1/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/12] |
Former [2007/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES BREMSSYSTEMS EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES | [2007/35] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A BRAKING SYSTEM OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2007/35] | French: | PROCEDE POUR COMMANDER UN SYSTEME DE FREINAGE D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 09.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4446219 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [YA]DE19532163 (CLOUTH GUMMIWERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 4 * column 37, line 63 - column 39, line 43; figure - * [A] 1,2; | [X]US6116363 (FRANK ANDREW A [US]) [X] 1,9 * column 10, line 26 - line 39; figure 12 *; | [YA]DE10101830 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 3,5,6 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0047] * [A] 1,2; | [XY]US2003230933 (SCHNEIDER MICHAEL JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0040]; figure - * [Y] 3-6; | [X]WO2004080774 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 3, line 3 - page 9, line 11; figure - * | by applicant | DE4446219 | DE19532163 | US6116363 | DE10101830 | US2003230933 | WO2004080774 |