EP1836070 - VEHICLE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Karl-Heinz Sulzgrieserstrasse 13 73733 Esslingen / DE | 02 /
HÖLZEL, Günter Im Stock 5 73269 Hochdorf / DE | 03 /
SCHMIDT-SPALDING, Helge Industriestrasse 9a 24536 Neumünster / DE | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Jürgen, et al Daimler AG Intellectual Property and Technology Management GR/VI, C106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Wagner, Jürgen, et al DaimlerChrysler AG Intellectual Property and Technology Management GR/VI, C106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05815814.8 | 13.12.2005 | [2007/39] | WO2005EP13351 | Priority number, date | DE20051001960 | 15.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005001960 | [2007/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006074780 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1836070 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1836070 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/44, B60N2/22 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
B60N2/99 (EP,US);
A47C7/405 (EP,US);
B60N2/02246 (EP,US);
B60N2/02253 (EP,US);
B60N2/02258 (EP,US);
B60N2/026 (EP,US);
B60N2/22 (EP,US);
B60N2/2222 (EP,US);
B60N2/643 (EP,US);
B60N2205/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/17] |
Former [2007/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSITZ | [2007/39] | English: | VEHICLE SEAT | [2007/39] | French: | SIEGE DE VEHICULE | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 31.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0107627 (CASTELLI SPA [IT]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2602133 (BOULAY MAURICE [FR]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE3707926 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE3910143 (IKEDA BUSSAN CO [JP], et al) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]DE9006316U ("AURA" HERBERT D. STOLLE GMBH & CO, 2000 HAMBURG, DE) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0537839 (CLERPREM SPA [IT]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |