EP1835841 - DISHWASHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2013/21] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Str. 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JERG, Helmut Ringental 15 89537 Giengen / DE | 02 /
PAINTNER, Kai Steigfeldstrasse 20 86477 Adelsried / DE | [2007/39] | Application number, filing date | 05816242.1 | 06.12.2005 | [2007/39] | WO2005EP56514 | Priority number, date | DE20041059425 | 09.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004059425 | DE20051004093 | 28.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005004093 | [2007/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006061381 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1835841 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1835841 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/48 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
A47L15/4291 (EP,US);
A47L15/48 (KR);
A47L15/481 (EP,US);
Y02B40/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Title | German: | GESCHIRRSPÜLMASCHINE | [2007/39] | English: | DISHWASHER | [2007/39] | French: | LAVE-VAISSELLE | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 29.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2005 | CY | 22.05.2013 | CZ | 22.05.2013 | DK | 22.05.2013 | EE | 22.05.2013 | FI | 22.05.2013 | LT | 22.05.2013 | LV | 22.05.2013 | MC | 22.05.2013 | NL | 22.05.2013 | RO | 22.05.2013 | SE | 22.05.2013 | SI | 22.05.2013 | SK | 22.05.2013 | BG | 22.08.2013 | GR | 23.08.2013 | IS | 22.09.2013 | PT | 23.09.2013 | AT | 06.12.2013 | GB | 06.12.2013 | IE | 06.12.2013 | LU | 06.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/30] | CY | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
AT | 06.12.2013 | ||
GB | 06.12.2013 | ||
IE | 06.12.2013 | ||
LU | 06.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CZ | 22.05.2013 | |
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
AT | 06.12.2013 | ||
GB | 06.12.2013 | ||
IE | 06.12.2013 | ||
LU | 06.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CZ | 22.05.2013 | |
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 06.12.2013 | ||
IE | 06.12.2013 | ||
LU | 06.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CZ | 22.05.2013 | |
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 06.12.2013 | ||
LU | 06.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CZ | 22.05.2013 | |
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
LU | 06.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CZ | 22.05.2013 | |
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
LU | 06.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 22.05.2013 | |
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 22.05.2013 | |
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 22.05.2013 | |
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | DK | 22.05.2013 | |
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 22.05.2013 | |
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 22.05.2013 | |
PT | 23.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE2016831 (BOSCH HAUSGERAETE GMBH) [DA] 4,6,8* page 2, paragraph 6 - page 4, paragraph 2 *; | [Y]FR2491322 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 6 - line 20 *; | [DA]EP0358279 (BAUKNECHT HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [DA] 4,5,7,8 * paragraph [0001] * * column 3, line 3 - line 38 * [A] 5,7,8,4; | [YA]DE10024892 (AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0011]; figures 1,3; claims 1,2 * * claim 10 * [A] 4 |