EP1827934 - ELECTROHYDRAULIC PRESSURE CONTROL DEVICE FOR AUTOMOTIVE BRAKE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2013/42] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEISE, Andreas Am Falltor 1 64390 Erzhause / DE | 02 /
ERLER, Wolfgang Hofgutstrasse 28 65232 Taunusstein / DE | [2007/42] |
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
HEISE, Andreas Am Bahnhof 5 64546 Mörfelden / DE | ||
02 /
ERLER, Wolfgang Hofgutstrasse 28 65232 Taunusstein / DE | Representative(s) | Michelsen, Markus c/o Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Brand, Markus c/o Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG, Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Brand, Markus c/o Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG, Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 05816263.7 | 13.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005EP56738 | Priority number, date | DE20041062719 | 21.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004062719 | DE20051059941 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005059941 | [2007/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006067070 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1827934 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1827934 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/36, H05K7/00, B60T17/00 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
B60T17/00 (KR);
B60T8/36 (KR);
B60T8/368 (EP);
H05K7/00 (KR);
H05K3/325 (EP);
H05K3/4015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, HU, IT [2008/13] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROHYDRAULISCHE DRUCKREGELVORRICHTUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGBREMSSYSTEME | [2007/36] | English: | ELECTROHYDRAULIC PRESSURE CONTROL DEVICE FOR AUTOMOTIVE BRAKE SYSTEMS | [2007/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION DE PRESSION ELECTROHYDRAULIQUE POUR SYSTEMES DE FREINAGE DE VEHICULES A MOTEUR | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 09.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2005 | IT | 16.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/38] | IT | 16.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE10036086 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,4,9,11,12,14 * column 3, line 59 - column 6, line 19; figure - * [A] 2,3; | [XA]DE10122330 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,12 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0066]; figure - * [A] 2,3,5,7-11,13,14; | [DA]DE10011807 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1041700 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0045]; figure - *; | [A]US6786466 (RISCH STEPHAN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0520047 | DE10011807 | DE10036086 |