EP1964908 - FISCHER-TROPSCH SYNTHESIS PROCESS USING BUBBLE COLUMN TYPE SLURRY-BED REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/36] | FISCHER-TROPSCH SYNTHESIS SYSTEM USING BUBBLE COLUMN TYPE SLURRY-BED REACTOR | ||
[2013/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumikin Engineering Co., Ltd. Osaki Center Building 5-1, Osaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Japan Oil Gas and Metals National Corporation 1310, Omiya-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-8554 / JP | For all designated states SEKIYUSHIGEN KAIHATSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-12, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | For all designated states COSMO OIL CO., LTD. 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8528 / JP | For all designated states INPEX Corporation 5-3-1 Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2014/48] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Engineering Co., Ltd 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
For all designated states Japan Oil Gas and Metals National Corporation 1310, Omiya-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-8554 / JP | |||
For all designated states SEKIYUSHIGEN KAIHATSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-12, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
For all designated states COSMO OIL CO., LTD. 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8528 / JP | |||
For all designated states INPEX Corporation 5-3-1 Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Engineering Co., Ltd 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
For all designated states Japan Oil Gas and Metals National Corporation 1310, Omiya-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-8554 / JP | |||
For all designated states SEKIYUSHIGEN KAIHATSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-12, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
For all designated states COSMO OIL CO., LTD. 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8528 / JP | |||
For all designated states Inpex Corporation 1-18, Ebisu 4-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONISHI, Yasuhiro c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8071; / JP | 02 /
FUJIMOTO, Kenichiro, c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | 03 /
IHARA, Masaru 1-2-2, Hamada, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-0025 / JP | 04 /
SUEHIRO, Yoshifumi 1-2-2, Hamada, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-0025 / JP | 05 /
MORITA, Yasumasa 1-6-23-407, Nakarokugo Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-0055 / JP | 06 /
INABA, Kiyoshi 4-8-19-305, Shinden Ichikawa-shi, Chiba 272-0035 / JP | 07 /
SHIMIZU, Toshio 1134-2, Gongendo Satte-shi, Saitama 340-0112 / JP | 08 /
IWAMOTO, Osamu 1134-2, Gongendo Satte-shi, Saitama 340-0112 / JP | [2014/48] |
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
ONISHI, Yasuhiro c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8071; / JP | ||
02 /
FUJIMOTO, Kenichiro, c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | |||
03 /
IHARA, Masaru 1-2-2, Hamada, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-0025 / JP | |||
04 /
SUEHIRO, Yoshifumi 1-2-2, Hamada, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-0025 / JP | |||
05 /
MORITA, Yasumasa 1-6-23-407, Nakarokugo Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-0055 / JP | |||
06 /
INABA, Kiyoshi 4-8-19-305, Shinden Ichikawa-shi, Chiba 272-0035 / JP | |||
07 /
SHIMIZU, Toshio 1134-2, Gongendo Satte-shi, Saitama 340-0112 / JP | |||
08 /
IWAMOTO, Osamu 1134-2, Gongendo Satte-shi, Saitama 340-0112 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/36] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05816400.5 | 14.12.2005 | [2008/36] | WO2005JP22975 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007069317 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1964908 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1964908 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C10G2/00, C07C1/04 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
B01J8/228 (EP,US);
C10G2/00 (KR);
B01J8/007 (EP,US);
B01J8/085 (EP,US);
B01J8/1818 (EP,US);
B01J8/22 (EP,US);
C10G2/342 (EP,US);
C10G65/12 (KR);
B01J2208/00123 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00539 (EP,US);
B01J2208/0061 (EP,US);
C10G2300/4006 (EP,US);
C10G2300/805 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/08] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FISCHER-TROPSCH-SYNTHESE-VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES SLURRY-BED-REAKTORS VOM BLASENSÄULENTYP | [2013/18] | English: | FISCHER-TROPSCH SYNTHESIS PROCESS USING BUBBLE COLUMN TYPE SLURRY-BED REACTOR | [2013/18] | French: | PROCEDE FISHER-TROPSCH UTILISANT UN REACTEUR A LIT DE SUSPENSION EPAISSE DE TYPE COLONNE A BULLES | [2013/18] |
Former [2008/36] | FISCHER-TROPSCH-SYNTHESE-SYSTEM UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES SLURRY-BED-REAKTORS VOM BLASENSÄULENTYP | ||
Former [2008/36] | FISCHER-TROPSCH SYNTHESIS SYSTEM USING BUBBLE COLUMN TYPE SLURRY-BED REACTOR | ||
Former [2008/36] | SYSTEME DE SYNTHESE DE FISHER-TROPSCH UTILISANT UN REACTEUR A LIT DE SUSPENSION EPAISSE DE TYPE COLONNE A BULLES | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2008 | Translation filed | 10.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 15.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6838487 (DEMIREL BELMA [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-11,13 * see figure, items 2,7,9-10-12-16-15,21-11,27. * [Y] 1-14; | [XY]WO02097007 (RENTECH INC [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7-11 * figure 1 (items 2,7,7a,4) * [Y] 1-14; | [XY]WO2005068407 (CONOCOPHILLIPS CO [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-10 * figure 6 (items 310, 320, 315,332,3324, 330, 334,360, 335 345, 357); figures 7-9. * [Y] 1-14; | [Y]US2003109591 (ZHOU PEIZHENG [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * see gigure; item 202 *; | [A]WO9850492 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003232894 (MOHEDAS SERGIO R [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH1066859 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR], et al); | [Y]US6068760 (BENHAM CHARLES B [US], et al); | [Y]JPH11349496 (AGIP PETROLI, et al) | by applicant | EP0450860 | US6348510 | US6462098 | US5844006 | US5770629 | US6121333 |