EP1801174 - ANTIFOG ARTICLE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND COATING MATERIAL FOR FORMING ANTIFOG COATING FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURATA, Noboru c/o Glass Research Center of CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LTD. 1510 Oguchi-cho Matsusaka-shi Mie 515-0001 / JP | 02 /
HIRUKAWA, Masahiro c/o Glass Research Center of CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LTD. 1510 Oguchi-cho Matsusaka-shi Mie 515-0001 / JP | 03 /
HIRANO, Toshihiro c/o Glass Research Center of CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LTD. 1510 Oguchi-cho Matsusaka-shi Mie 515-0001 / JP | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05816905.3 | 16.12.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005JP23133 | Priority number, date | JP20040366551 | 17.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004366551 | [2007/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006064904 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801174 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09D175/12, B05D7/24, C03C17/28, C09D7/12, C09K3/00, C03C17/32, C08G18/08, C08G18/40, C08G18/65, C08G18/78 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
C08G18/4063 (EP,KR,US);
C09D175/12 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/28 (EP,US);
C03C17/322 (EP,US);
C08G18/0828 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/0885 (KR);
C08G18/6529 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/7831 (EP,US);
C08L75/12 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/26] | C09D175/04, B05D7/24, C03C17/28, C09D7/12, C09K3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/13] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIBESCHLAGGEGENSTAND, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIAL ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ANTIBESCHLAGBESCHICHTUNG | [2007/26] | English: | ANTIFOG ARTICLE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND COATING MATERIAL FOR FORMING ANTIFOG COATING FILM | [2007/26] | French: | ARTICLE ANTIBUEE, PROCEDE POUR LE PRODUIRE ET MATERIAU DE REVETEMENT DESTINE A FORMER UN FILM ANTIBUEE | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2007 | Translation filed | 23.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 30.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 29.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4467073 (CREASY WALTER S [US]) [Y] 1-6 * claims 1-14 * * examples X-XIII *; | [A]WO9803575 (FILM SPECIALTIES INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-14 ** examples 1-7 *; | [YD]WO2004013063 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [YD] 1-6 * claims 1-17 * * examples 1-16 * | International search | [A]JPS63112669 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JPH07126342 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE, et al); | [A]JP2003201331 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND); | [A]JP2004244612 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD); | [A]JP2004269851 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD); | [AP]JP2005029723 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD); | [AP]JP2005187276 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) |