Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008160187 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004366551 | 17.12.2004 | WO2005JP23133 | 16.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1801174 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2013 | A4 | EP1801174 | 27.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004366551 | 17.12.2004 | WO2005JP23133 | 16.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101065456B | 29.12.2010 | B | CN101065456 | 31.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004366551 | 17.12.2004 | WO2005JP23133 | 16.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006064904 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004366551 | 17.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100850829B | Global Dossier | 06.08.2008 | B1 | KR20070086251 | 27.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004366551 | 17.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4887622B | Global Dossier | 29.02.2012 | B2 | JP2006169440 | 29.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004366551 | 17.12.2004 |