|
29.03.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2018 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.02.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.02.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
05.02.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2011 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2008 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2008 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2008 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.10.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.10.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.10.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
29.10.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
29.10.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.10.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.10.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.10.2007 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
15.01.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.01.2007 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.01.2007 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |