Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007065382 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005DE02210 | 06.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7989776 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2011 | B2 | US2008283749 | 20.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005DE02210 | 06.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4848017B | Global Dossier | 28.12.2011 | B2 | JP2009518784 | 07.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005DE02210 | 06.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1958231 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2018 | B1 | EP1958231 | 20.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005DE02210 | 06.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112005003818 | 13.11.2008 | A5 | Priority number | Date | WO2005DE02210 | 06.12.2005 |