EP1768905 - VACUUM PACKAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/14] | VACUUM PACKAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
[2016/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states West Pharmaceutical Services, Inc. 530 Herman O. West Drive Exton, PA 19341 / US | For all designated states DAIKYO SEIKO, LTD. 38-2, Sumida 3-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-0031 / JP | [2017/16] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states West Pharmaceutical Services, Inc. 101 Gordon Drive Lionville, PA 19454 / US | ||
For all designated states DAIKYO SEIKO, LTD. 38-2, Sumida 3-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDER BUSH, Edward 130 Krauser Road Downingtown, PA 19335 / US | 02 /
NASE, Robert 19 Estates Drive Reading, PA 19606 / US | 03 /
TOGASHIARE, Hiroshi Ueshimo-cho 603-1 Sano-shi, Tochigi 327-0835 / JP | 04 /
JANSEN, Hubert Muesterblick 6 D-52223 Stolberg / DE | 05 /
PAPROSKI, John 201 Stefan Road North Wales, PA 19454 / US | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Kunst, Manuel Nikolaus Johannes, et al Maucher Jenkins Patent-und Rechtsanwälte Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [2017/20] |
Former [2014/37] | Kunst, Manuel Nikolaus Johannes, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | ||
Former [2007/14] | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | Application number, filing date | 05818179.3 | 30.06.2005 | [2007/14] | WO2005US23138 | Priority number, date | US20040584826P | 01.07.2004 Original published format: US 584826 P | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006028562 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1768905 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1768905 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65B31/00, B65B5/06 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
B65B31/06 (EP,US);
A61M5/002 (EP,US);
B65B5/067 (EP,US);
B65D77/0446 (EP,US);
B65D81/203 (EP,US);
A61M2207/00 (EP,US);
A61M2209/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/20] |
Former [2007/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VAKUUMVERPACKUNGSVERFAHREN UND VAKUUMVERPACKUNGSSYSTEM | [2017/19] | English: | VACUUM PACKAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2017/19] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE CONDITIONNEMENT SOUS VIDE | [2017/19] |
Former [2007/14] | VAKUUMVERPACKUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2007/14] | VACUUM PACKAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
Former [2007/14] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE CONDITIONNEMENT SOUS VIDE | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 06.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2005 | AT | 17.05.2017 | CY | 17.05.2017 | CZ | 17.05.2017 | DK | 17.05.2017 | EE | 17.05.2017 | ES | 17.05.2017 | FI | 17.05.2017 | IT | 17.05.2017 | LT | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | NL | 17.05.2017 | PL | 17.05.2017 | PT | 17.05.2017 | RO | 17.05.2017 | SE | 17.05.2017 | SI | 17.05.2017 | SK | 17.05.2017 | TR | 17.05.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | LU | 30.06.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | IS | 17.09.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.06.2005 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.06.2005 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.06.2005 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3643812 (MANDER ROBERT J, et al) [Y] 2-6,8-10,12,19,20 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US3850340 (SIEMONSEN F, et al) [Y] 14 * figure 2 *; | [I]US6161695 (NICOLAIS LAWRENCE B [US]) [I] 1,15* the whole document *; | [A]WO0182817 (CLOSURE MEDICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [Y]NL1018898C (MICRONIC B V [NL]) [Y] 2-4 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE10205458 (SIG COMBIBLOC SYS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,11,15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0037] * [Y] 2-6,8-10,12,14,19,20 | International search | [Y]US2629421 (AYRES WILLIAM H); | [Y]US3643812 (MANDER ROBERT J, et al); | [Y]US3850340 (SIEMONSEN F, et al); | [Y]US6161695 (NICOLAIS LAWRENCE B [US]) | Examination | WO0240063 | by applicant | DE10205458 |