EP1815070 - VALVES FOR FUEL CARTRIDGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société BIC 14, rue Jeanne d'Asnières 92611 Clichy Cedex / FR | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMS, Paul 21 Perry Drive Monroe, CT 06468 / US | 02 /
CURELLO, Andrew, J. 15 Eramo Terrace Hamden, CT 06518 / US | 03 /
FAIRBANKS, Floyd 103 Birch Lane Naugatuck, CT 06770 / US | 04 /
SGROI, Anthony, Jr. 28 Hintz Drive Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/32] | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05818335.1 | 31.10.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005US39267 | Priority number, date | US20040978949 | 01.11.2004 Original published format: US 978949 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006050261 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1815070 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1815070 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16L29/00, H01M8/04 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
H01M8/04201 (EP,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
F16L37/32 (EP,US);
F16L37/36 (EP,US);
H01M8/04208 (EP,US);
H01M8/04216 (EP,US);
H01M8/1011 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8122 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/28] | F16L29/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/32] | E03B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Title | German: | VENTILE FÜR BRENNSTOFFKASSETTEN | [2007/32] | English: | VALVES FOR FUEL CARTRIDGES | [2007/32] | French: | VANNES POUR CARTOUCHES DE COMBUSTIBLE | [2007/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 29.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2005 | AT | 23.05.2012 | BE | 23.05.2012 | CY | 23.05.2012 | CZ | 23.05.2012 | DK | 23.05.2012 | EE | 23.05.2012 | LT | 23.05.2012 | LV | 23.05.2012 | NL | 23.05.2012 | PL | 23.05.2012 | RO | 23.05.2012 | SE | 23.05.2012 | SI | 23.05.2012 | SK | 23.05.2012 | TR | 23.05.2012 | BG | 23.08.2012 | GR | 24.08.2012 | IS | 23.09.2012 | PT | 24.09.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | IE | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | LU | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
TR | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LU | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
TR | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 23.05.2012 | |
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | LT | 23.05.2012 | |
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 23.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6003547 (TIPPMANN JR DENNIS J [US]) [X] 1-13 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 65 *; | [X]EP1306917 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] *; | [XP]WO2005013393 (BIC SOC [FR], et al) [XP] 1-13* page 8, paragraph 27 - page 10, paragraph 6 * | International search | [X]US6523863 (ISHIWATA KAZUTAMI [JP]); | [X]US6644331 (ARISATO AKIRA [JP]); | [X]US5042678 (MUNGUIA PRESTON T [US]); | [X]US5544785 (FRIGIERE RENE [FR]) | by applicant | US20030679756 | US20030629006 |