EP1812390 - METHYLPHENIDATE ANALOGS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Froimowitz, Mark 90 Eatbourne Road Newton, MA 02459 / US | For all designated states Kelley, Charles J. 12 Everett Avenue Providence, RI 02906 / US | [2007/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Engels, Barbara Fleischer, Godemeyer, Kierdorf & Partner, Patentanwälte Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Engels, Barbara Fleischer, Godemeyer, Kierdorf & Partner, Patentanwälte Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05818965.5 | 21.10.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005US38030 | Priority number, date | US20040621342P | 22.10.2004 Original published format: US 621342 P | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006047330 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1812390 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/12, C07D211/14, A61K31/4458, A61P25/28 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
C07D211/14 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07D211/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHYLPHENIDAT-ANALOGA UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | [2007/31] | English: | METHYLPHENIDATE ANALOGS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2007/31] | French: | ANALOGUES DE METHYLPHENIDATE ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION ASSOCIES | [2007/31] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 07.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 07.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO03005962 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-58 * claims 1-46 *; | [Y]WO0217919 (SENTION INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-58 * claims 1-15 *; | [Y]WO9936403 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-58 * claims 1-26 *; | [Y] - DEUTSCH H M ET AL, Synthesis and pharmacology of site specific cocaine abuse treatment agents: a new synthetic methodology for methylphenidate analogs based on the Blaise reaction, EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUE ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, PAGE(S) 303-311, (200105), ISSN 0223-5234, XP004255692 [Y] 1-58 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0223-5234(01)01230-2 | [Y] - DEUTSCH H M ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND PHARMAMOLOGY OF POTENTIAL COCAINE ANTAGONISTS. 2. STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIP STUDIES OF AROMATIC RING- SUBSTITUTED METHYLPHENIDATE ANALOGS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (19960315), vol. 39, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1201 - 1209, XP000602079 [Y] 1-58 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm950697c | [Y] - FROIMOWITZ M ET AL, Further evidence for a dopamine reuptake pharmacophore. The effect of N-methylation on threo-methylphenidate and its analogs, BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, PAGE(S) 1213-1218, (19970506), ISSN 0960-894X, XP004136217 [Y] 1-58 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(97)00193-5 |