EP1958414 - APPARATUS, METHOD,COMPUTER PROGRAM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR SEAMLESS SESSION TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/34] | APPARATUS, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR SEAMLESS SESSION TRANSFER | ||
[2016/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2016/25] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) Patent Unit 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÖHMAN, Peter Senapsgränd 8 S-182 45 Enebyberg / SE | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2016/25] |
Former [2014/45] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2014/21] | Tholin, Thomas, et al Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Herbjörnsen, Rut, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05819108.1 | 09.12.2005 | [2008/34] | WO2005SE01881 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007067109 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1958414 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1958414 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
H04L65/1083 (EP,US);
H04L49/25 (US);
H04L65/1094 (EP);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04L67/56 (EP,US);
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/25] |
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN, COMPUTERPROGRAMM and COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUM NAHTLOSEN WEITERLEITEN EINER SITZUNG | [2016/17] | English: | APPARATUS, METHOD,COMPUTER PROGRAM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR SEAMLESS SESSION TRANSFER | [2016/17] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR LE TRANSFERT DE SESSION EN CONTINU | [2016/17] |
Former [2008/34] | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM FÜR NAHTLOSEN SITZUNGSTRANSFER | ||
Former [2008/34] | APPARATUS, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR SEAMLESS SESSION TRANSFER | ||
Former [2008/34] | APPAREIL, PROCEDE ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR LE TRANSFERT DE SESSION EN CONTINU | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 28.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 05.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2005 | AT | 22.06.2016 | BE | 22.06.2016 | BG | 22.06.2016 | CY | 22.06.2016 | CZ | 22.06.2016 | DK | 22.06.2016 | EE | 22.06.2016 | ES | 22.06.2016 | FI | 22.06.2016 | IT | 22.06.2016 | LT | 22.06.2016 | LV | 22.06.2016 | MC | 22.06.2016 | NL | 22.06.2016 | PL | 22.06.2016 | RO | 22.06.2016 | SE | 22.06.2016 | SI | 22.06.2016 | SK | 22.06.2016 | TR | 22.06.2016 | GR | 23.09.2016 | IS | 22.10.2016 | PT | 24.10.2016 | IE | 09.12.2016 | LU | 09.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | FR | 02.01.2017 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 09.12.2005 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
TR | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
IE | 09.12.2016 | ||
LU | 09.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 09.12.2005 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
IE | 09.12.2016 | ||
LU | 09.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
IE | 09.12.2016 | ||
LU | 09.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 22.06.2016 | |
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 22.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; IP Multimedia Subsystem (IMS); Stage 2 (Release 7)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.228, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20050901), no. V7.1.0, pages 1 - 189, XP050363295 [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0004] - [4.2.4] - [04.6] - [4.4.6.3] - [5.11.6] - [5.11.6.2.3]; figure 5.42 * | [A] - STUDENT: CHEN-JUI PENG ADVISOR: REN-HUNG HWANG, "SSIP: Split a SIP Session over Multiple Devices", INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://140.123.21.32/ETD-db/ETD-search/getfile?URN=etd-0727105-020000 &filename=etd-0727105-020000.pdf, (20080304), XP007904234 [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [003.] , [5.2.]; figures 8,9,22 * | International search | [X] - OHTA K. ET AL., "Adaptive terminal middleware for session mobility", PUB - PROCEEDINGS 23RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS WORKSHOPS, (20030519), XP010642403 | [A] - SHACHAM R. ET AL., "The virtual device: expanding wireless communication services through service discovery and session mobility", 2005 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WIRELESS AND MOBILE COMPUTING, NETWORKING AND COMMUNICATIONS. IEEE WIMOB 2005, (20050822), vol. 4, pages 73 - 81, XP010839733 |