EP1813081 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SCHEDULING PACKETS FOR ROUTING IN A NETWORK WITH IMPLICIT DETERMINATION OF PACKETS TO BE TREATED AS A PRIORITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | [2013/39] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states France Telecom S.A. 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERTS, James 3 Rue Emeraude F-78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR | 02 /
OUESLATI, Sara 31 Rue de Fontenay F-92320 Chatillon / FR | 03 /
KORTEBI, Abdesselem 2 Avenue Lulli F-92310 SEVRES / FR | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/02] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2007/31] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 Rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05819159.4 | 15.11.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005FR50949 | Priority number, date | FR20040012063 | 15.11.2004 Original published format: FR 0412063 | [2007/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006051244 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1813081 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1813081 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
H04L47/20 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L47/11 (EP,US);
H04L47/15 (EP,US);
H04L47/2441 (EP,US);
H04L47/50 (EP,US);
H04L47/525 (EP,US);
H04L47/527 (EP,US);
H04L47/621 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PAKETKOORDINATION ZUM ROUTEN IN EINEM NETZWERK MIT IMPLIZITER BESTIMMUNG VON ALS PRIORITÄT ZU BEHANDELNDEN PAKETEN | [2007/31] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SCHEDULING PACKETS FOR ROUTING IN A NETWORK WITH IMPLICIT DETERMINATION OF PACKETS TO BE TREATED AS A PRIORITY | [2007/31] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ORDONNANCEMENT DE PAQUETS POUR LEUR ROUTAGE DANS UN RESEAU AVEC DETERMINATION IMPLICITE DES PAQUETS A TRAITER EN PRIORITE | [2007/31] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 29.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15150092.3 / EP2940960 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2005 | AT | 07.01.2015 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | DK | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | FI | 07.01.2015 | IT | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | NL | 07.01.2015 | PT | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | SE | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 15.11.2005 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 07.01.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X] - TSAO S-C ET AL, "Pre-order Deficit Round Robin: a new scheduling algorithm for packet-switched networks", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (200102), vol. 35, no. 2-3, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 287 - 305, XP004304846 [X] 1,4,5,10,11 * paragraph [3.PRE.ORDER.DEFICIT.ROUND.ROBIN]; figure 2 * * paragraph [3.2.ALGORITHM]; figure 3 * * figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1286(00)00172-9 | [A] - KANHERE S S ET AL, "Fair, efficient and low-latency packet scheduling using nested deficit round robin", HIGH PERFORMANCE SWITCHING AND ROUTING, 2001 IEEE WORKSHOP ON 29-31 MAY 2001, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20010529), ISBN 0-7803-6711-1, pages 6 - 10, XP010542761 [A] 1-11 * paragraph [II.DEFICIT.ROUND.ROBIN] * * paragraph [III.NESTED.ROUND.ROBIN]; figures 1,2 * | [A] - MACGREGOR M H ET AL, "Deficits for bursty latency-critical flows: DRR++", NETWORKS, 2000. (ICON 2000). PROCEEDINGS. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SEPTEMBER 5-8, 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000905), ISBN 0-7695-0777-8, pages 287 - 293, XP010514114 [A] 1-11 * paragraph [1.3.DRR.PLUS.PLUS] * | [A] - S. BEN FREDJ, S. OUESLATI-BOULAHIA AND J.W. ROBERTS, "Measurement-based Admission Control for Elastic Traffic", ITC17, SALVADOR, BRAZIL, (200112), XP002332468 [A] 1-11 * paragraph [4.MEASUREMENT.BASED.ADMISSION.CONTROL] * | [DA] - SHREEDHAR M ET AL, "EFFICIENT FAIR QUEUING USING DEFICIT ROUND-ROBIN", IEEE / ACM TRANSACTIONS ON NETWORKING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19960601), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1063-6692, pages 375 - 385, XP000591077 [DA] 1-11 * paragraph [III.DEFICIT.ROUND.ROBIN]; figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/90.502236 | by applicant | FR2854296 | - M. SHREEDHAR; G. VARGHESE, "Efficient fair queuing using Deficit round robin", IEEE/ACM TRANSACTIONS ON NETWORKING, (199606), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 375 - 385 | - TSAO ET AL., Pre-order Déficit Round Robin : a new scheduling algorithm for packet-switched networks, COMPUTER NETWORKS ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (20010203), vol. 35 |