20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
18.12.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
13.11.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
03.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
21.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
14.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
09.01.2015 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] |
12.12.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
28.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.10.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.10.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.06.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.06.2014 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
02.04.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.12.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.08.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
22.03.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.11.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.06.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.02.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.12.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.03.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] |
14.02.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.02.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.09.2008 |
First examination report |
|
25.09.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.04.2008 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
05.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] |
29.06.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] |
23.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|