Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8311049 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2012 | B2 | US2007291644 | 20.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005FR50949 | 15.11.2005 | FR0412063 | 15.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4762996B | Global Dossier | 31.08.2011 | B2 | JP2008520141 | 12.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005FR50949 | 15.11.2005 | FR0412063 | 15.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2940960 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2020 | B1 | EP2940960 | 04.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005FR50949 | 15.11.2005 | FR0412063 | 15.11.2004 | EP05819159 | 15.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1813081 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2015 | B1 | EP1813081 | 01.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005FR50949 | 15.11.2005 | FR0412063 | 15.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101057481B | 25.05.2011 | B | CN101057481 | 17.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005FR50949 | 15.11.2005 | FR0412063 | 15.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2533774T | 15.04.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005FR50949 | 15.11.2005 | FR0412063 | 15.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1813081T | 30.06.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005FR50949 | 15.11.2005 | FR0412063 | 15.11.2004 | EP05819159 | 15.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006051244 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0412063 | 15.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2799698T | 21.12.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR0412063 | 15.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2878106 | 19.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0412063 | 15.11.2004 | Type | Divisional application | EP2940960 |