EP1838589 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC MARKING, IDENTIFICATION AND TRACING OF SUBSTANCES OR CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/40] | CONTAINER WITH TRANSPONDER | ||
[2010/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dynamic Systems GmbH Inniger Strasse 11 82237 Wörthsee / DE | [2011/22] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Dynamic Systems GmbH Technopark Oberpfaffenhofen Argelsrieder Feld 11 82234 Wessling / DE | ||
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states Lossau, Harald Ettalstrasse 34 81377 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lossau, Harald Ahornstrasse 7 82237 Wörthsee / DE | [2011/16] |
Former [2007/40] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Zeuner Summerer Stütz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Nußbaumstraße 8 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | Zeuner & Summerer Nußbaumstrasse 8 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Zeuner, Stefan Zeuner & Summerer Hedwigstrasse 9 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/40] | Zeuner, Stefan Hedwigstrasse 9 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05819232.9 | 15.12.2005 | [2007/40] | WO2005EP13478 | Priority number, date | DE20041061633 | 17.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004061633 | [2007/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006066787 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1838589 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1838589 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/16] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1838589 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D23/14, B01L3/14, G06K19/077 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
B01L3/5453 (EP,US);
B01L3/545 (EP,US);
B65D23/14 (EP,US);
B01L2300/022 (EP,US);
B01L2300/024 (EP,US);
B65D2203/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN KENNZEICHNUNG, IDENTIFIKATION UND VERFOLGUNG VON SUBSTANZEN ODER BEHÄLTERN | [2010/35] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC MARKING, IDENTIFICATION AND TRACING OF SUBSTANCES OR CONTAINERS | [2010/35] | French: | SYSTEME ET METHODE POUR LE MARQUAGE, L'IDENTIFICATION ET LE SUIVI DE SUBSTANCES OU DE RECIPIENTS DE MANIERE AUTOMATIQUE | [2010/44] |
Former [2007/40] | BEHÄLTER MIT TRANSPONDER | ||
Former [2007/40] | CONTAINER WITH TRANSPONDER | ||
Former [2007/40] | RECIPIENT A TRANSPONDEUR | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.04.2011 | CZ | 20.04.2011 | DK | 20.04.2011 | EE | 20.04.2011 | FI | 20.04.2011 | HU | 20.04.2011 | IE | 20.04.2011 | IT | 20.04.2011 | LT | 20.04.2011 | LV | 20.04.2011 | NL | 20.04.2011 | PL | 20.04.2011 | RO | 20.04.2011 | SE | 20.04.2011 | SI | 20.04.2011 | SK | 20.04.2011 | TR | 20.04.2011 | BG | 20.07.2011 | GR | 21.07.2011 | ES | 31.07.2011 | IS | 20.08.2011 | PT | 22.08.2011 | LU | 15.12.2011 | BE | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | FR | 02.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
IT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
TR | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
LU | 15.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
IT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
LU | 15.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
IT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
LU | 15.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/19] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
IT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
IT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
IT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
IT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 20.04.2011 | |
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 20.04.2011 | |
PT | 22.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002185358 ; | [A]FR2413652 (ULTRAKUST GERAETEBAU [DE]) [A] 1-3,27,28 * page 3, line 14 - line 23; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5491483 (D HONT LOEK J [NL]) [X] 1-3,10-18,22,24-26,32-37,39-42 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 53; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]DE19645892 (EPPENDORF GERAETEBAU NETHELER [DE]) [DA] 4-7,38 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2791035 (ALLIBERT EQUIPEMENT [FR]) [A] 43-45,49-51* figures 1-9; claims 1-12 *; | [X]WO0207085 (MARCONI CORP P L C [GB]) [X] 8,9,31,34,36 * page 11, line 1 - line 9 * * page 25, line 8 - line 18; figures 1-15b *; | [X]US6482287 (DE GAULLE ANTOINE [FR]) [X] 37,43-45,49-51,53 * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 65 * * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 17; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1419977 (LINPAC PLASTICS GMBH [DE]) [A] 43-45,49-51 * column 4, line 37 - column 6, line 3; figures 2-4 *; | [PX]US2005051624 (KIPP TIMO W [GB], et al) [PX] 8,9,31,34,36 * page 2, paragraph 17 - paragraph 19; figure 1 *; | [PA]WO2005058718 (CEBAL SAS [FR], et al) [PA] 1-3,10-18,22,24-26,32-34,36,54-58 * page 11, line 7 - page 15, line 22; figures 3-6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021010), vol. 2002, no. 10, & JP2002185358 A 20020628 (SUPERSENSOR PTY LTD) [A] 1-3,10-18,22,24-26,29,32-34,36,54-58 * abstract * | by applicant | US5491483 | JP2002185358 | US2004176872 |